Jackson v. Milwaukee County Jail
Plaintiff: Marcel T Jackson
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Case Number: 2:2021cv00022
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/19/21 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that complies with the instructions in this order on or before March 22, 2021. (cc: all counsel, Lucas, Brand and mailed to pro se party w/form)(jad)
January 29, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $87.13, receipt number MK4689-08296. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED- Request Report from Marcel T Jackson. (jcl)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Marcel T Jackson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 1/29/21 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 83.17 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/8/21. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marcel T Jackson. (jcl)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Marcel T Jackson. (jcl)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Milwaukee County Jail by Marcel T Jackson. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Milwaukee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel T Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?