Mark v. Schwartz
Plaintiff: Jonathon M Mark
Defendant: Susan Schwartz
Case Number: 2:2021cv00023
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/9/2021 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. The plaintiff is to appear by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and entering access code 4893665#. (cc: via mail to Jonathon Mark) (cb) Modified on 2/16/2021 (cb).
January 13, 2021 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jonathon M Mark. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jonathon M Mark. (amb)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Jonathon M Mark by Jonathon M Mark. (amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark v. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon M Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?