Country Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jason Johnston, Country Mutual Insurance Company and Pornchanok Johnston
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric, MJC america, Gree USA Inc, GREE ELECTRIC, MJC america holdings, co., inc, Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai, John Does 1-10, MJC America Ltd doing business as Soleus International Inc, ABC Insurance Companies, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD and MJC America Holdings Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00068
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Schuster, Richard)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Schuster, Richard)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Schuster, Richard)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Schuster, Richard)
February 5, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Country Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schuster, Richard)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai, Gree USA Inc, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD, MJC America Holdings Co Inc, MJC America Ltd.(Regan, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai. (Regan, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by MJC America Ltd. (Regan, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD. (Regan, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gree USA Inc. (Regan, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by MJC America Holdings Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MJC Holdings Dissolution)(Regan, James)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gree Electric, Hong Kong Gree Electric, MJC america holdings, co., inc, MJC america, Gree USA Inc, GREE ELECTRIC from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020cv001095 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3699575) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and complaint, #3 Exhibit Order notice of scheduling conference, #4 Exhibit Proof of service, #5 Exhibit Proof of service, #6 Exhibit Proof of service, #7 Exhibit Proof of service, #8 Exhibit Proof of service, #9 Exhibit Notice of appearance)(Regan, James)
January 14, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Johnston
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pornchanok Johnston
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric
Represented By: James Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC america
Represented By: James Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc
Represented By: James Regan
Represented By: Marissa L Dellacroce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREE ELECTRIC
Represented By: James Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC america holdings, co., inc
Represented By: James Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances Inc of Zhuhai
Represented By: James Regan
Represented By: Marissa L Dellacroce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd doing business as Soleus International Inc
Represented By: James Regan
Represented By: Marissa L Dellacroce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliance Sales LTD
Represented By: James Regan
Represented By: Marissa L Dellacroce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Holdings Co Inc
Represented By: James Regan
Represented By: Marissa L Dellacroce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?