Lindh v. Rymarkewicz et al
Plaintiff: Aaron J Lindh
Defendant: Nurse Ahlborg, Captain Larson, Tonia Moon, Sgt Barrett, Robert Rymarkewicz, CO Orr, Manager Weinman, Warden Hepp, Sgt Sonntag, Jodie Barret and Randall Hepp
Case Number: 2:2021cv00115
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Sgt Barrett, Warden Hepp, Tonia Moon, Robert Rymarkewicz (Paulson, Rebecca)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca A Paulson on behalf of Sgt Barrett, Warden Hepp, Tonia Moon, Robert Rymarkewicz. Attorney(s) appearing: Rebecca A. Paulson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paulson, Rebecca)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/1/21 that defendants Captain Larson, Sergeant Sonntag, Nurse Ahlborg, Correctional Officer Orr, and Health Services Manager Weinman are DISMISSED. Copy of the complaint and this order have been electronically transmitted to the WI Dept of Justice for service on defendants Robert Rymarkewicz, Sergeant Barret, Warden Hepp, and Tonia Moon. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
February 17, 2021 FILING FEE Received: $402, receipt number MK4689-085478. (jcl)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/4/21 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff must pay the $402.00 filing fee on or before February 25, 2021, by submitting a check or money order made payable to the Clerk of Court. (cc: all counsel, warden and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aaron J Lindh. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cmb)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Aaron J Lindh. (cmb)
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Aaron J Lindh. (cmb)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Aaron J Lindh. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindh v. Rymarkewicz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Ahlborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonia Moon
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rymarkewicz
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manager Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Sonntag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodie Barret
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Hepp
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron J Lindh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?