Markovic et al v. Monarch Recovery Management Inc
Plaintiff: Nicole Markovic, John Hahn and Jeffrey Holmes
Defendant: Monarch Recovery Management Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00152
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/30/2021. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 4/12/2021; Plaintiff's motion for class certification due 9/6/2021, brief in opposition due within 30 days, reply due 21 days thereafter; Plaintiffs' Expert Witness List due by 12/20/2021; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 1/24/2022; Discovery due by 2/14/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 3/14/2022, response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil LR 56 apply, parties to file joint status report if they choose not to file dispositive motion. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by John Hahn, Jeffrey Holmes, Nicole Markovic. (Eldridge, Mark)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/25/2021. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 3/29/2021. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
February 24, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Monarch Recovery Management Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Metcho, Ronald)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Monarch Recovery Management Inc.(Metcho, Ronald)
February 9, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website -Party names should not include punctuation. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc.. (Metcho, Ronald)
February 9, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monarch Recovery Management, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020cv006735 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3728827) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A")(Metcho, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markovic et al v. Monarch Recovery Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Markovic
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Ben James Slatky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hahn
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Ben James Slatky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Holmes
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Ben James Slatky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Recovery Management Inc
Represented By: Ronald M Metcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?