Halford v. Frederick et al
Plaintiff: Earnest L Halford
Defendant: Abby Frederick and Jason McHugh
Case Number: 2:2021cv00279
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Letter (Interview/Information Request Form) regarding mail from the Court (lh)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/20/2021. By May 10, 2021, the plaintiff, Earnest L. Halford shall file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by using the form included with this order. If Halford fails to do so by that date, the court will dismiss his case. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party with form)(mlm)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Earnest L Halford. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(lh)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and DECLARATION in Support by Earnest L Halford. (mac)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Earnest L Halford. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cav)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/6/2021. The court DENIES plaintiff Earnest L. Halford's Motion to Compel #5 as premature. To proceed with his case, Halford must either pay the full $350 filing fee or file a motion to proceed without prepaying the filing fee along with a certified copy of his six-month trust account statement by April 14, 2021, as the court stated in its March 24, 2021 order #3 . Failure to do so will result in dismissal of his case. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plintiff)(lz)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support (Unsigned) filed by Earnest L Halford re #5 MOTION to Compel. (cav)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION (Unsigned) of Ernest Halford (cav)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION (Unsigned) to Compel Discovery by Earnest L Halford. (cav)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 EXHIBITS submitted by Ernest Halford (mac)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/24/2021. By April 14, 2021, the plaintiff Earnest L. Halford shall either pay the full $350 filing fee, or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of his six-month trust account statement, or submit a written explanation regarding why he cannot do either. Halford's failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of his case. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Earnest L. Halford re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Earnest L Halford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halford v. Frederick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest L Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McHugh
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?