Dalton v. Lucas et al
Plaintiff: Derrion O Dalton
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail Facility and Earnell Lucas
Case Number: 2:2021cv00396
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/17/21. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/17/21 that this case is DISMISSED for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. The plaintiff may refile his case at a later date, subject to the relevant statute of limitations. (cc: all counsel, warden and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that on or before 5/5/21 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 10.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/21/21. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Derrion O Dalton. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (rcm)
April 7, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 4/20/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 10.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 3/30/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and Warden)(rcm)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Derrion O. Dalton re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (rcm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Derrion O Dalton. (rcm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Derrion O Dalton. (rcm)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Earnell Lucas, Milwaukee County Jail Facility by Derrion O Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalton v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnell Lucas
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrion O Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?