Leventhal v. RPOC et al
Plaintiff: Howard E Leventhal
Defendant: RPOC Officers, Jeffrey Sisley, Unknown, RPOC, Paul Malloy, Sandy A Williams, Barry Boline, Steven Cain, Adam Gerol, Ozaukee County Board, Josh Kaul, Wisconsin Department of Justice and State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2021cv00545
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk in favor of defendants against Howard E Leventhal. Approved by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 6/23/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amb)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 6/23/2021. The complaint and amended complaint are frivolous. Accordingly, the case is dismissed with prejudice. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amb)
June 18, 2021 Filing 18 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Howard E Leventhal re: proof of service on defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (amb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by RPOC, RPOC Officers. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Baird, Brian)
June 8, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to defendants RPOC, RPOC Officers requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by RPOC, RPOC Officers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Mailings to Plaintiff)(Baird, Brian)
June 7, 2021 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to Prisoner Complaint by RPOC, RPOC Officers.(Baird, Brian)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W Baird on behalf of RPOC, RPOC Officers. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian W Baird (Baird, Brian)
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Steven Cain, Adam Gerol, Josh Kaul, Paul Malloy, Jeffrey Sisley, State of Wisconsin, Sandy A Williams, Wisconsin Department of Justice. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Simcox, Jeffery)
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM as to PLRA Status, NOTICE of Change of Address, and CONSENT to Electronic Service by Howard E Leventhal. Address updated to 276 S Military Rd, Fond du Lac, WI 54935. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(amb)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Barry Boline, Ozaukee County Board. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge)(Keeler, William)
May 28, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery A Simcox on behalf of Steven Cain, Adam Gerol, Josh Kaul, Paul Malloy, Jeffrey Sisley, State of Wisconsin, Sandy A Williams, Wisconsin Department of Justice. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffery A. Simcox (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Simcox, Jeffery)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/25/2021. Defendants are on notice that because the plaintiff is incarcerated, the Prison Litigation Reform Act applies. As such, the court must first screen the plaintiffs amended complaint for cognizable claims and the defendants do not need to respond to the amended complaint until the court issues its screening order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(amb)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barry Boline, Ozaukee County Board (Keeler, William)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William E Keeler, III on behalf of Barry Boline, Ozaukee County Board. Attorney(s) appearing: William E. Keeler, III (Keeler, William)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Barry Boline, Ozaukee County Board. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard E Leventhal. State of Wisconsin c/o Attorney General served on 5/12/2021. (kah)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Howard Leventhal. (amb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Howard E Leventhal. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attachment, #3 Envelope)(amb)
May 4, 2021 FILING FEE PAID IN FULL receipt# MK468908621907 $402.00 (bx)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM of Fact and Law by Howard Leventhal. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits)(amb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Howard E Leventhal. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Howard E Leventhal. Fee coming in separate mailing. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leventhal v. RPOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPOC Officers
Represented By: Brian W Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Sisley
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPOC
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Brian W Baird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Malloy
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy A Williams
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Boline
Represented By: William E Keeler, III
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Cain
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Gerol
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozaukee County Board
Represented By: William E Keeler, III
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Kaul
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Justice
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Jeffery A Simcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard E Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?