Froedtert Health Inc et al v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls Inc, Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc, Drexel Town Square Surgery Center LLC, St Joseph's Community Hospital of West Bend Inc, Froedtert Surgery Center LLC, West Bend Surgery Center LLC, Froedtert Health Inc, Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians Inc and Inception Health Services LLC
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00713
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by plaintiffs(vkb)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 8/4/2021 re: #14 Agreed Civil L. R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS the motion. (cc: all counsel)(kmm)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and MOTION For Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint (Agreed) by Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls Inc, Drexel Town Square Surgery Center LLC, Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians Inc, Froedtert Health Inc, Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc, Froedtert Surgery Center LLC, Inception Health Services LLC, St Joseph's Community Hospital of West Bend Inc, West Bend Surgery Center LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Draft of First Amended Complaint (Redlined), #2 Exhibit B- Draft of First Amended Complaint (Clean), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vishneski, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 8/4/2021 (vkb)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Chiang on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer Chiang (Chiang, Jennifer)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Nadia S. Abramson (Vishneski, John)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 6/28/21 (re: #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint). The Court GRANTS the unopposed motion. The defendant must file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint on or before 8/9/21. (cc: all counsel)(kwb)
June 25, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Noyes, Kelly)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (Schirle, Kenneth)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schirle, Kenneth)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Barger on behalf of Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan K. Barger (Barger, Jonathan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C Schirle on behalf of Factory Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Kenneth Clark Schirle (Schirle, Kenneth)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadia Abramson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Nadia S. Abramson (Abramson, Nadia)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vishneski, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: John S. Vishneski III (Vishneski, John)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J Noyes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Kelly J. Noyes (Noyes, Kelly)
June 11, 2021 Summons Issued as to Factory Mutual Insurance Company. (mlm)
June 10, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Lovern, Susan)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Factory Mutual Insurance Company by Froedtert Surgery Center LLC, Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians Inc, Drexel Town Square Surgery Center LLC, West Bend Surgery Center LLC, Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc, Inception Health Services LLC, Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls Inc, Froedtert Health Inc, St Joseph's Community Hospital of West Bend Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3840928) (Attachments: #1 Information Sheet Exhibit A - FM Policy, #2 Information Sheet Exhibit B - History, #3 Information Sheet Exhibit C - Talking Points, #4 Summons to (D) Factory Mutual Insurance Company, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lovern, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Froedtert Health Inc et al v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Memorial Hospital of Menomonee Falls Inc
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drexel Town Square Surgery Center LLC
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Joseph's Community Hospital of West Bend Inc
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Froedtert Surgery Center LLC
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Surgery Center LLC
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Froedtert Health Inc
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Froedtert & The Medical College of Wisconsin Community Physicians Inc
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inception Health Services LLC
Represented By: Susan E Lovern
Represented By: Jennifer Chiang
Represented By: John Vishneski, III
Represented By: Kelly J Noyes
Represented By: Nadia Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Barger
Represented By: Kenneth C Schirle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?