Balsewicz v. Bowen et al
Plaintiff: John H Balsewicz
Defendant: Varnisha Bowen, Tonia Moon, Randall Hepp, James Muenchow, CO Robert J Rymarkiewicz, Yana Pusich and Aimee Wilson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00748
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-01069. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that Plaintiff's motions to transfer these cases, dkt. #15 in case no. 20-cv-596-wmc and dkt. #12 in case no. 20-cv-1096-wmc, are GRANTED. Case nos. 20-cv-596-wmc and 20-cv-1096-wmc are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/17/2021. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Letter requesting status update, notice of change of address, request for three complaint forms. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 Letter requesting status update, notice of change of address, request for three complaint forms by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Account statement, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Letter Requesting Status Update. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 13 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for a Change of Venue by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Amended Appendage, #2 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 Warden PLRA Letter. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Partial Filing fee received: $22.60, receipt number 34690038038. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiffs John H. Balsewicz (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 22.60 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 12/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/30/20. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Mark "Nicole Rose" Campbell by Plaintiff John Balsewicz (Attachments: #1 Offender Complaint, #2 ICE Report WCI-2016-5781, #3 Reviewing Authority's Decision WCI-2016-5781) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of William Haywood by Plaintiff John Balsewicz (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Declaration of Chance "Kaylie" Erdmann by Plaintiff John Balsewicz (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Letter sent to WI DOJ for PLRA Certification) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by John H. Balsewicz. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification of Three or More Dismissals, #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service of Summons, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons, #5 Appendage In Support) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balsewicz v. Bowen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varnisha Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonia Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Hepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Muenchow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Robert J Rymarkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yana Pusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H Balsewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?