Negethon v. Wilkens et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Negethon
Defendant: Timothy Zachery Wilkens, Michael Alan Hendrickson, Oshkosh Police Department and Roberto Martinez Martinez
Case Number: 2:2021cv00764
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 TRANSMIT Notice, Waiver, Complaint, Screening Order to USMS for service upon three defendants. (asc)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 8/09/21 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee; defendant Oshkosh Police Department is DISMISSED from this case; Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Dkt. No. #6 ) is DENIED without prejudice; FURTHER ORDERING that #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED as moot; FURTHER ORDERING that the US Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order upon defendants Wilkens, Hendrickson, and Martinez and those defendants shall file a responsive pleading; FURTHER ORDERING that the agency having custody of the plaintiff shall collect the $350.00 balance of the filing fee (Attachments: #1 Answer to Frequently Asked Questions) (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, sheriff and the city attorney for the City of Oshkosh)(vkb)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for a 45-60 day Extension of Time to submit initial partial filing fee by Daniel Edward Negethon. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(kmm)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Edward Negethon. (kah)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 6/25/21 that within 30 days from the date of this order plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 0.68 as an initial partial filing fee in this action (cc: all counsel and mailed to sheriff and pro se party)(vkb)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by plaintiff Daniel Edward Negethon (vkb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk to Daniel Edward Negathon requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph within 21 days. Plaintiff must also submit his six-month certified trust account statement. (tlf)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Daniel Edward Negethon. (tlf)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Daniel Edward Negethon. (tlf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Negethon v. Wilkens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Zachery Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Alan Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oshkosh Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Martinez Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Edward Negethon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?