Cornford-Matheson v. ABC Corp
Plaintiff: Alison Cornford-Matheson
Defendant: ABC Corp d/b/a LaMacchia Travel Agency and ABC Corp doing business as LaMacchia Travel Agency
Case Number: 2:2021cv00776
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alison Cornford-Matheson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sanders, Craig)
August 3, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
August 2, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to BOTH PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (kah)
August 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 8/1/21. Defendant's consent motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. Defendant may have until September 15, 2021, to file its response to the plaintiff's complaint. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint by ABC Corp. (Jansson, Eric)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric VC Jansson on behalf of ABC Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric V.C. Jansson (Jansson, Eric)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly H McKinley on behalf of ABC Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Molly H. McKinley (McKinley, Molly)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter N Jansson on behalf of ABC Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Peter N. Jansson (Jansson, Peter)
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alison Cornford-Matheson. ABC Corp served on 7/9/2021. (Sanders, Craig)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Alison Cornford-Matheson (Sanders, Craig)
June 25, 2021 Summons Issued as to ABC Corp. (kah)
June 24, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against ABC Corp d/b/a LaMacchia Travel Agency by Alison Cornford-Matheson. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3851535) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit 2 Infringing Use of Photograph, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)
June 23, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornford-Matheson v. ABC Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Cornford-Matheson
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp d/b/a LaMacchia Travel Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp doing business as LaMacchia Travel Agency
Represented By: Eric VC Jansson
Represented By: Molly H McKinley
Represented By: Peter N Jansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?