Guyette v. Fields et al
Plaintiff: Ashley J Guyette
Defendant: Casey Fields and New London Police Department
Case Number: 2:2021cv00791
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $50.00, receipt number MK4689-4689086966. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ashley J Guyette. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 7/30/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 48.62 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 6/30/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and warden)(amb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ashley J Guyette. (amb)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ashley J Guyette. (amb)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Ashley J Guyette. (amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyette v. Fields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New London Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley J Guyette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?