Dixon v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Marvin Dixon
Defendant: United States and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00830
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Marvin Dixon. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Scherr, Werner)
July 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (kah)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Marvin Dixon (Scherr, Werner)
July 9, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Marvin Dixon (Scherr, Werner)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States by Marvin Dixon. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3863943)(Scherr, Werner) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
July 8, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Dixon
Represented By: Werner Erich Scherr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?