Johnson v. Synchrony Bank et al
Plaintiff: Christopher J Johnson
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, Oklahoma FMS Inc, MRS BPO LLC and Nationwide Credit Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00837
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE Statement by MRS BPO LLC. (Armstrong, Bradley)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support filed by MRS BPO LLC re #15 MOTION to Dismiss . (Armstrong, Bradley)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by MRS BPO LLC. (Armstrong, Bradley)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Synchrony Bank. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Strickland, Julia)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Synchrony Bank. (Strickland, Julia)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia B Strickland on behalf of Synchrony Bank. Attorney(s) appearing: Julia B. Strickland (Strickland, Julia)
August 18, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation #9 filed by Oklahoma FMS Inc signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 8/10/2021. Oklahoma FMS, Inc.'s Answer due September 20, 2021. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
August 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Oklahoma FMS Inc answer due 9/20/2021. (llc)
August 10, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Oklahoma FMS Inc. requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E Cunningham on behalf of Oklahoma FMS Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew E. Cunningham (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Oklahoma FMS Inc. (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Oklahoma FMS Inc. (Cunningham, Andrew)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I Marcus on behalf of Oklahoma FMS Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Morgan I. Marcus (Marcus, Morgan)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christopher J Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brady, Joshua)
July 13, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
July 9, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (bx)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Christopher J Johnson. (Brady, Joshua)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher J Johnson (Brady, Joshua)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher J Johnson (Brady, Joshua)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher J Johnson (Brady, Joshua)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Christopher J Johnson (Brady, Joshua)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Christopher J Johnson. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3865665) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits to Complaint)(Brady, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Synchrony Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J Johnson
Represented By: Joshua J Brady
Represented By: Zachary L Enstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Julia B Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma FMS Inc
Represented By: Andrew E Cunningham
Represented By: Morgan I Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS BPO LLC
Represented By: Bradley R Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Credit Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?