Henyard vs Eplett
Petitioner: Keith C henyard
Respondent: Warden Cheryl Eplett
Case Number: 2:2021cv00839
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Cheryl Eplett to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Judgment of Conviction, #2 Ex. B - WI Ct. App. Decision Affirming, #3 Ex. C - WI Sp. Ct. Order Denying PR, #4 Ex. D - Ct. App. Brief and Appendix, #5 Ex. E - Response Brief, #6 Ex. F - Reply Brief, #7 Ex. G - Petition for Review, #8 Ex. H - State's Response to PR, #9 Ex. I - TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Hearing 12-28-2016, #10 Ex. J - TRANSCRIPT of Hearing 1-24-17, #11 Ex. K - TRANSCRIPT - Bail_Bond Hearing 3-07-17, #12 Ex. L - TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial 4-28-17, #13 Ex. M - TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference 5-18-17, #14 Ex. N - TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference 5-30-17, #15 Ex. O - TRANSCRIPT of Adjourned Hearing, #16 Ex. P - TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial 8-16-17, #17 Ex. Q - TRANSCRIPT of Jury Selection Scheduled Plea Agreement8-21-17, #18 Ex. R - TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hearing 10-12-17, #19 Ex. S - TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing 2-04-19)(O'Brien, Daniel)
July 23, 2021 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
July 22, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Keith C Henyard. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rose, Christopher)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Cheryl Eplett. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (O'Brien, Daniel)
July 22, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Keith C Henyard ; Document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge. This document must be RE-FILED; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J O'Brien on behalf of Cheryl Eplett. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel J. O'Brien (O'Brien, Daniel)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Keith C Henyard. (Rose, Christopher)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Cheryl Eplett (Collins, Winn)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a copy of Henyard's petition and this order shall be served upon the respondent by service upon the State of Wisconsin Attorney General. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the respondent is directed to serve and file an answer, motion, or other response to the petition, complying with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Habeas Corpus Cases, within SIXTY (60) days of the date of this order. (See order for additional deadlines) (cc: all counsel)(asc)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 DISREGARD; INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Keith C Henyard. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rose, Christopher) Modified on 7/22/2021 (asc).
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Keith C Henyard. Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Rose, Christopher)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Keith C Henyard. ( Filing Fee PAID $5 receipt number AWIEDC-3867754) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rose, Christopher)
July 13, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henyard vs Eplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith C henyard
Represented By: Christopher W Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Cheryl Eplett
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?