Sanchez et al v. Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Sanchez and Jose Antonio Reyes
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Services and Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00893
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/30/2021 APPROVING #36 stipulation of dismissal. Case DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 26, 2021 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims by Roadrunner Transportation Services, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrewscavage, Charles)
August 26, 2021 Case Terminated pursuant to #36 Stipulation of Dismissal. (asc)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/23/2021. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 9/13/2021. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 20, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. This case is related to Case No. 21cv864 which was transferred to this district from the Northern Dist of CA and randomly assigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 07/22/2021. (kmm)
August 13, 2021 Filing 34 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Roadrunner Transportation Services, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrewscavage, Charles)
August 13, 2021 Filing 33 DISCLOSURE Statement by Roadrunner Transportation Services, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. (Andrewscavage, Charles)
August 2, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Andrewscavage on behalf of Roadrunner Transportation Services, Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Charles Andrewscavage (Andrewscavage, Charles)
July 29, 2021 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00890. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE. The action is ordered transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2021. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 22, 2021. (mmclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue ) filed byRoadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Sanchez 2020 ICOA, #2 Exhibit B-Reyes 2020 ICOA)(Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 6/9/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
May 28, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue ) filed byJose Antonio Reyes, Jose Francisco Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Pogrel, David) (Filed on 5/28/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 26 Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to #25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byRoadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2021. Replies due by 6/9/2021. (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 5/11/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 5/25/2021. Replies due by 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 5/11/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 4/21/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.. Filed byJose Francisco Sanchez, Jose Antonio Reyes. (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 4/20/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED PENDING MOTIONS AND SCHEDULING. Plaintiffs will file the proposed First Amended Complaint within one business day of the date of this order. Defendants will withdraw their motion to dismiss or transfer within two business days of plaintiffs' filing of the First Amended Complaint. Defendants will have 21 days to respond to the First Amended Complaint. If the response is a motion to dismiss and/or transfer, it shall be filed no later than May 11, 2021; plaintiffs' opposition thereto shall be filed no later than May 28, 2021; defendants' reply shall be filed no later than June 9, 2021; and the hearing is scheduled for June 25, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference scheduled for May 14, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 20, 2021. (Attachment #1 Exhibit A) (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Giselle Olmedo (Olmedo, Giselle) (Filed on 4/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re First Amended Complaint and Related Pending Motions and Scheduling filed by Jose Antonio Reyes, Jose Francisco Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Pogrel, David) (Filed on 4/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE - MAY 14, 2021 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel participating in the conference call are directed to email their name and direct phone number to: mmccrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Due to multiple hearings, counsel are directed to be on telephone stand-by from 10:30 AM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 4/26/2021. Replies due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 4/12/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Jose Antonio Reyes, Jose Francisco Sanchez re #16 Case Management Scheduling Order, Proof of Service (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2021.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/25/2021. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 15 Case reassigned to Judge Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc... (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Carl Smedstad (Smedstad, Adam) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr (McNatt, Christopher) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Anthony Eckhart (Eckhart, James) (Filed on 2/19/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING RELATED CASES. Garcia v. Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., 20-cv-06918 MMC, is related to Sanchez v. Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., 21-cv-00890. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 16, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jose Francisco Sanchez, Jose Antonio Reyes. Service waived by All Defendants. (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 2/16/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2021 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 5, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #3 Proposed Summons f iled by Jose Francisco Sanchez, Jose Antonio Reyes (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 2/4/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Waiver of Service (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 2/4/2021) Modified on 2/5/2021 (msrS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pogrel, David) (Filed on 2/4/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc., Roadrunner Transportation Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15534266.). Filed byJose Francisco Sanchez, Jose Antonio Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pogrel, David) (Filed on 2/4/2021) [Transferred from cand on 7/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Sanchez
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Reyes
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Services
Represented By: Adam Carl Smedstad
Represented By: Christopher C McNatt, Jr
Represented By: James Anthony Eckhart
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Transportation Systems Inc
Represented By: Adam Carl Smedstad
Represented By: Christopher C McNatt, Jr
Represented By: James Anthony Eckhart
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?