Williams v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Travis Delaney Williams
Defendant: Sarah Martin, Sheryl Kinyon, Jamie Adams and Dr Edward Riley
Case Number: 2:2021cv00934
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Travis Williams (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked exhibits 1 and 2)(lh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Travis Delaney Williams re #15 Order. (lh)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 9/29/2021 that Williams must pay the initial partial filing fee of $0.54 by the end of the day October 15, 2021. If the court does not receive the initial partial filing fee by the deadline, the court will dismiss this case without prejudice based Williams's failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. If Williams no longer wants to pursue this case, he does not need to take any further action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and Warden, WSPF)(kah)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION AUTHENTICATING EXHIBITS filed by Travis Delaney Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (with bookmarks))(tlf)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Travis Delaney Williams. (tlf)
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Travis Delaney Williams to the Court's #10 Order and in support of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (tlf)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Travis Delaney Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 8/26/2021 denying #7 Motion to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee. Williams must pay the initial partial filing fee of $0.54 by the end of the day September 14, 2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kah)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Incomplete Magistrate Consent form filed by Travis D. Williams (lh)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 9/10/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 0.54 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 8/10/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and warden)(amb)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to Travis Williams re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Travis Williams (mac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Travis Delaney Williams. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Delaney Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Martin
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Kinyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Edward Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?