Coleman v. Kiefer et al
Plaintiff: Brian K Coleman
Defendant: Judge Rebecca Kiefer, Katie Bakunowicz, Milwaukee County Jail(s) and Shorewood Police Department
Case Number: 2:2021cv00940
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021 (kah)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 10/1/2021 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and dismissing the complaint for failure to state a claim; amended complaint to be filed by 11/1/2021. Further ordered that the balance of the filing fee in the amount of $329.96 be collected by the institution. (Attachments: #1 Amended complaint form, #2 Prisoner Guide) (cc: all counsel, Milw County Jail and mailed to pro se party with attachments)(kmm)
September 3, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $20.04, receipt number MK4689-087329. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (bx)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brian K Coleman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 8/11/2021 that within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $20.04 as an initial partial filing fee in this action (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, sheriff and Dennis Brand )(vkb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE from the clerk mailed to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Joseph be filed within 21 days (vkb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by plaintiff Brian K Coleman (vkb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Brian K Coleman (vkb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brian K Coleman (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Kiefer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Rebecca Kiefer
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Bakunowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail(s)
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorewood Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?