Trotter v. Milwaukee County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Jyrone Jrotter and Tyrone Trotter
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail and K Jackson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00941
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 9/17/21 that on or before 30 days from the date of this order plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $10.76 as an initial partial filing fee in this action (cc: all counsel and mailed to Sheriff, Dennis Brand and pro se party)(vkb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by plaintiff Tyrone Trotter(vkb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by plaintiff Tyrone Trotter. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 9/13/2021. Plaintiff has until 10/4/2021 to file a trust account statement or pay the full filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kmm)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Sent to "Jyrone Jrotter" Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate; re-mailed to Tyrone Trotter (vkb)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (asc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jyrone Jrotter. (asc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Jyrone Jrotter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotter v. Milwaukee County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jyrone Jrotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?