Hudson v. Kiefer et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy L Hudson
Defendant: Judge Rebecca A Kiefer, Samuel Tufford and Milwaukee County Jail
Case Number: 2:2021cv01017
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $63.83, receipt number MK4689-87593. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jeremy L Hudson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amb)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that on or before 10/1/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 63.83 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 8/31/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, Milwaukee County Sheriff, and Dennis Brand)(amb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jeremy L Hudson. (amb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jeremy L Hudson. (amb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Jeremy L Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Kiefer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy L Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Rebecca A Kiefer
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Tufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?