Tomlinson et al v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Donald Tomlinson, United States of America Department of Health and Human Services, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin and West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Michael N Anderson and United States
Case Number: 2:2021cv01039
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Tomlinson. (Ogren, Ryan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Tomlinson. (Ogren, Ryan)
November 3, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Donald Tomlinson and #7 Summons Returned Executed filed by Donald Tomlinson ; This document does not match the docket entry, the summons are blank; Please re-file these documents; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 DISREGARD; INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Tomlinson. (Ogren, Ryan) Modified on 11/4/2021 (asc).
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 DISREGARD; INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Tomlinson., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Tomlinson. (Ogren, Ryan) Modified on 11/4/2021 (asc).
November 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (amb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of SUMMONS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Tomlinson (Ogren, Ryan) Modified on 11/2/2021 (amb).
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United States, United States filed by Donald Tomlinson.(Ogren, Ryan)
September 20, 2021 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Donald Tomlinson. (Ogren, Ryan)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ogren, Ryan)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against United States Postal Service by Donald Tomlinson. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3913733)(Ogren, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
September 7, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomlinson et al v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Tomlinson
Represented By: Ryan Ogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?