Jones v. Donovan
Plaintiff: William Jones
Defendant: Mike Donovan
Case Number: 2:2021cv01109
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mike Donovan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Paulson, Rebecca)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (bx)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:21-cv-00269. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that defendant's motion to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, dkt. #11 , is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/22/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
September 22, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)
September 21, 2021 Filing 15 Brief in Reply by Defendant Mike Donovan in Support of #11 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stroud, Colin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff William Jones re: #11 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue filed by Mike Donovan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Mike Donovan. (Stroud, Colin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Colin R. Stroud filed by Defendant Mike Donovan re: #11 Motion to Dismiss (Stroud, Colin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue by Defendant Mike Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stroud, Colin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
August 25, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 9/14/2021. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 9/24/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Colin Ritchey Stroud for Defendant Mike Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Stroud, Colin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendant Mike Donovan. (Paulson, Rebecca),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca Ann Paulson for Defendant Mike Donovan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Paulson, Rebecca),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendant Mike Donovan. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/28/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Partial Filing fee received: $15.24, receipt number 34690038792. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 15.24 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/23/2021. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff William Jones (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff submit a Trust Fund Account Statement by 5/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 04/21/2021. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Jones. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by William Jones. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 9/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Donovan
Represented By: Colin R Stroud
Represented By: Rebecca A Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?