Thompson et al v. Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carol M Thompson, Donna M Fay, The Estate of Donna M Fay and Rose M Knaup
Defendant: VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER, ABC Insurance Company, SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, DEF Insurance Company, SAVASENIORCARE CONSULTING. LLC, GHI Insurance Company, Xavier Becerra, UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF WISCONSIN, INC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Unitedhealthcare of Wisconsin Inc and SSC Germantown Operating Company LLC doing business as Virginia Highlands Health and Rehabilitation Center doing business as Virginia Highlands Hlth & Rehab Ctr doing business as Virginia Highlands Hr doing business as Virginia Highlands
Case Number: 2:2021cv01137
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by SSC Germantown Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rosenstein, Joshua)
October 25, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by SSC Germantown Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC Notice of Filing (Carden, Terrence)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay and MOTION to Compel Arbitration by SSC Germantown Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - DRP, #2 Ex B - Complaint)(Carden, Terrence). Added MOTION to Compel on 10/20/2021 (asc).
October 6, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SAVASENIORCARE CONSULTING. LLC, VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER. (Rosenstein, Joshua)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M Rosenstein on behalf of SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, SAVASENIORCARE CONSULTING. LLC, VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER. Attorney(s) appearing: Joshua M. Rosenstein (Rosenstein, Joshua)
October 4, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER, SAVASENIORCARE CONSULTING. LLC from Washington, Case Number: 2021 CV 000417 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3936221) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Carden, Terrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol M Thompson
Represented By: Ryan J Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Donna M Fay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose M Knaup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS HEALTH AND REHABILITATION CENTER
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVASENIORCARE ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVASENIORCARE CONSULTING. LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE OF WISCONSIN, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Joshua M Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Joshua M Rosenstein
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitedhealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Germantown Operating Company LLC doing business as Virginia Highlands Health and Rehabilitation Center doing business as Virginia Highlands Hlth & Rehab Ctr doing business as Virginia Highlands Hr doing business as Virginia Highlands
Represented By: Joshua M Rosenstein
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?