Hollins v. Moungey et al
Plaintiff: Emon V Hollins
Defendant: CO Goodman, CO Moungey, Andrew Moungey, Christopher Pass, Jeffrey Perry, Capt. Rymarkiewicz, Anthony Meli, CO Gould and Whyte
Case Number: 2:2021cv01204
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 10/29/21. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge Brett H Ludwig no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(MP)
October 29, 2021 Filing 42 LETTER from plaintiff requesting mediation (vkb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 41 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by plaintiff Emon V Hollins. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (vkb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 40 REQUEST by Emon V Hollins for status conference. (kah)
October 21, 2021 Filing 39 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days. (kah)
October 20, 2021 Filing 38 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Moungey, Christopher Pass, Jeffrey Perry. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grzebielski, Kevin)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 10/20/21. Discovery due by 3/21/2022. Motions due by 4/21/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(MP)
October 18, 2021 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00188. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff now concedes that venue is improper in this district because the events took place in the Eastern District of Wisconsin and all defendants live in the Eastern District. Accordingly, defendants' motion to transfer, Dkt. #25 , is GRANTED and this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/15/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Brief in Reply to #25 Motion to Transfer due 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/31/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 33 Letter regarding August 26, 2021 deadline by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Interview/information request) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Filing 32 Response by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins re: #25 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue filed by Perry, Pass, Andrew Moungey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Plaintiff's motion to extend his deadline to respond to defendants' motion to transfer, dkt. #30 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's new response deadline is August 27, 2021. Defendants' new reply deadline is September 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/30/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 30 Letter from Emon Hollins requesting extension to file Brief in Opposition to #25 Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Court of Appeals Briefing Schedule for Appeal 20-2109, #2 Envelope). (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 29 Declaration of Andrew Moungey filed by Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry re: #25 Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin. Brief in Opposition due 8/11/2021. Brief in Reply due 8/23/2021. (lam),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry. (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 27 Declaration of Kelly Salinas filed by Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry re: #25 Motion to Transfer (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 26 Declaration of Yana Pusich filed by Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry re: #25 Motion to Transfer (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 24 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 23 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry. (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin L Grzebielski for Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, Perry. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Andrew Moungey, Pass, and Perry. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Anthony Meli, Rymarkiewicz, Whyte, J. Goodman and Gould. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/21/2021. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 Letter from the Clerk's Office in response to #18 Plaintiff's request for confirmation of his change of address and #19 Plaintiff's letter requesting a status update. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 19 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 18 Letter from Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins requesting confirmation of the court's receipt of his change of address. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 17 Disregard; wrong case. (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Emon V. Hollins re #14 Supplement to #1 Complaint (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Emon V. Hollins (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that plaintiff Emon V. Hollins may have until November 3, 2020, to submit a supplement to his complaint addressing the pleading problems discussed above. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order, Dkt. #6 , is denied. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/15/2020. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Eric Conley (Exhibit 2) filed by Plaintiff Emon Hollins re: #11 Supplement to #10 Plaintiff's letter to inform the court of retaliation re: #6 Motion for TRO. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 Supplement to #10 Plaintiff's letter to inform the court of retaliation re: #6 Motion for TRO, filed by Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Adult Conduct Report) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 Letter to inform the court of retaliation by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins re: #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 Supplement / letter dated 3/16/20 to #6 Motion for TRO filed by Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Interview/information request, 3/12/20, #2 Exhibit B - Disbursement request, 3/12/20) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 Supplement / letter dated 3/12/20 to #6 Motion for TRO filed by Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Security Director from plaintiff, 3/4/20, #2 Interview/information request, 3/4/20) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff's complaint taken under advisement pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/13/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 13, 2020 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 34690036562. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's office response to #4 letter from plaintiff. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins requesting invoice be sent to him for the $400 filing fee. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Declarations of James Davis and Jose Soto (Exhibit 5 to #1 Complaint) filed by Plaintiff Emon V. Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Jose Soto) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Declaration of Emon V. Hollins (Exhibit 1 to #1 Complaint). (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emon V. Hollins. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Interview/Information Request, #2 Exhibit 3 - Opinion & Order in 17-cv-738-jdp dated 7/2/18, #3 Exhibit 4 - Cover Page and Page 12 of Waupun Correctional Institution Rules & Information Handbook, #4 Exhibit 6 - Adult Conduct Report, #5 Exhibit 7 - Inmate Complaint, #6 Exhibit 8 - Inmate Complaint WCI-2018-16542 and WCI-2018-14746, #7 Exhibit 9 - Interview/Information Request, #8 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Injury and Claim, #9 Exhibit 11 - Adult Conduct Report, #10 Exhibit 12 - Inmate Complaint WCI-2018-17522, #11 Exhibit 13 - Inmate Complaint WCI-2018-17708, #12 Exhibit 14 - Inmate Complaint WCI-2018-16856, #13 Exhibit 15 - Letter to Meli from Plaintiff dated 12/5/18, #14 Exhibit 16 - Inmate Complaint WCI-2018-25980) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/18/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollins v. Moungey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Moungey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Moungey
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Pass
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Perry
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Rymarkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Meli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emon V Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?