Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund et al v. KPH Construction Services LLC
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, Building & Public Works Laborers Vacation Fund, WISCONSIN LABORERS APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING FUND, John J Schmitt, Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund, Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Doug Edwards and Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Defendant: KPH CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC and KPH Construction Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01233
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Williams, Jennifer)
November 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 09:15 AM by Telephone before Judge Brett H Ludwig. To appear, the parties must call the Court conference line at 1-866-434-5269, and enter access code 1737450# before the scheduled hearing time. (cc: all counsel) (MP)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G Vliet on behalf of KPH Construction Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Dan G. Vliet (Vliet, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (vkb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Williams, Jennifer)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Williams, Jennifer)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Flanary on behalf of KPH Construction Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Matt J. Flanary (Flanary, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Williams on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer Williams (Williams, Jennifer)
October 25, 2021 Summons Issued as to KPH Construction Services LLC. (vkb)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sterling, Alexander)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Sterling, Alexander)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Wisconsin Laborers District Council, Doug Edwards, Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund, John J Schmitt, WISCONSIN LABORERS APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING FUND, Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Building & Public Works Laborers Vacation Fund, Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3954949) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sterling, Alexander)
October 22, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund et al v. KPH Construction Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Health Fund
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building & Public Works Laborers Vacation Fund
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WISCONSIN LABORERS APPRENTICESHIP & TRAINING FUND
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Schmitt
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust Fund
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers District Council
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Edwards
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Laborers Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Alexander Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPH CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KPH Construction Services LLC
Represented By: Daniel G Vliet
Represented By: Jennifer L Williams
Represented By: Matthew J Flanary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?