Shott v. Rush University Medical Center
Plaintiff: Susan Shott
Defendant: Rush University Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv01243
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Susan Shott re #13 Expedited MOTION to Reset Rule 26 DatesExpedited MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Dates -- DEFENDANTS CIVIL L.R. 7(h) EXPEDITED NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTION TO STAY AND/OR RESET RULE 26 DATES. (rcm)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 Expedited MOTION to Reset Rule 26 Dates, Expedited MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Dates -- DEFENDANTS CIVIL L.R. 7(h) EXPEDITED NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTION TO STAY AND/OR RESET RULE 26 DATES by Rush University Medical Center. (Maldonado, Nancy)
December 10, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #11 MOTION to Dismiss -- MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(2), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Rush University Medical Center ; When filing motions which contain multiple parts the filer should select all applicable parts from the motion event list. In this case you should have also chosen Motion to Transfer. This document does not need to be re-filed ; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
December 9, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Rush University Medical Center re #11 MOTION to Dismiss -- MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(2), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exh. 1 -- Secretary of State Corporation File Detail Report with Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exh. 2 -- Declaration of Ryan Nagdeman, #4 Exh. 3 -- Declaration of Ashley Ballard, #5 Exh. 4 -- Declaration of Dr. Jochen Reiser, #6 Exh. 5 -- Google Maps printout, #7 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Nancy)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss -- MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(2), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Rush University Medical Center. (Maldonado, Nancy). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 12/10/2021 (rcm).
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 9:45 AM by Telephone before Judge J P Stadtmueller. The court will initiate the call. No later than 12:00 PM the day prior to the hearing, counsel shall notify chambers at 414-297-1122 of the direct telephone number at which they may be reached. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 12/28/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(rcm)
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roisin Duffy-Gideon on behalf of Rush University Medical Center. Attorney(s) appearing: Roisin Duffy-Gideon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Duffy-Gideon, Roisin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy Maldonado on behalf of Rush University Medical Center. Attorney(s) appearing: Nancy L. Maldonado (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Nancy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Rush University Medical Center. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Miller, Ryan)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/9/2021. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's motion to extend the time to respond to Plaintiffs complaint (Docket #5 ) be and the same is hereby GRANTED; Defendant must file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Thursday, December 9, 2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(rcm)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Rush University Medical Center. (Miller, Ryan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Rush University Medical Center. (Miller, Ryan)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Miller on behalf of Rush University Medical Center. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan Miller (Miller, Ryan)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (rcm)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Shott. Rush University Medical Center served on 10/28/2021. (rcm)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Rush University Medical Center filed by Susan Shott. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William Duffin. Jury Demand (Filing Fee PAID ; 87778) (Service Packet Issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shott v. Rush University Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Shott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush University Medical Center
Represented By: Nancy Maldonado
Represented By: Roisin Duffy-Gideon
Represented By: Ryan Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?