Kewening v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jennifer M Kewening
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv01246
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 11/24/21 and electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 1/24/22. Plaintiffs brief due 3/7/22; Defendants response due 4/18/22; Plaintiffs reply due 5/3/22. (cc: all counsel)(MP)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Certified Mail SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer M Kewening. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Binder, Charles) Modified on 11/23/2021 (blr).
November 23, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Jennifer M Kewening. The incorrect event was chosen. The correct event was Return of Service by Certified Mail. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jennifer M Kewening. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Binder, Charles)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer M Kewening. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Binder, Charles)
October 26, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Jennifer M Kewening ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3957242) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Binder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kewening v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer M Kewening
Represented By: Charles E Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?