Marjanovic v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Slobodanka Marjanovic
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2021cv01299
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/27/2021. Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Stipulated administrative record due by 4/14/2022. Cross motions for summary judgment due by 5/12/2022, responses due by 6/9/2022. Parties to file joint status report by 5/12/2022 if they choose not to file summary judgment motions. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Discovery Plan REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Slobodanka Marjanovic. (Parsons, William)
December 14, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rademaekers, Iwana)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/8/2021. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 12/29/2021. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 7, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
December 7, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Slobodanka Marjanovic. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 11/16/2021. (Parsons, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Slobodanka Marjanovic. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Parsons, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Slobodanka Marjanovic. (Parsons, William)
November 12, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
November 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (asc)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston by Slobodanka Marjanovic. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3971068) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parsons, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marjanovic v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slobodanka Marjanovic
Represented By: William E Parsons
Represented By: Naomi R Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?