Direct Supply Inc v. Park Supply of America Inc
Plaintiff: Direct Supply Inc
Defendant: Park Supply of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv01300
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Only Order signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/29/21 granting #16 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Direct Supply, Inc., may file its response to Park Supply of America, Inc.'s motion to dismiss on or before January 24, 2022. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Motion to Dismiss by Direct Supply Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Agreed Order)(Laing, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Austen Zuege on behalf of Park Supply of America Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Austen Zuege (Zuege, Austen)
December 17, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Park Supply of America Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brunner, Shane)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Park Supply of America Inc. (Brunner, Shane)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Austen Zuege In Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aug. 25, 2021 letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sept. 2, 2021 letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oct. 7, 2021 letter)(Brunner, Shane)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support filed by Park Supply of America Inc re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal . (Brunner, Shane)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal by Park Supply of America Inc. (Brunner, Shane)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane A Brunner on behalf of Park Supply of America Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Shane A. Brunner (Brunner, Shane)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M Konkel on behalf of Park Supply of America Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura M. Konkel (Konkel, Laura)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Direct Supply Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Laing, Michael)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Direct Supply Inc. Park Supply of America Inc served on 11/22/2021. (Laing, Michael)
November 11, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Laing, Michael)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Direct Supply Inc. (Laing, Michael)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Laing on behalf of Direct Supply Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael R. Laing (Laing, Michael)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Direct Supply Inc (Laing, Michael)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Park Supply of America Inc by Direct Supply Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3971072) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laing, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Direct Supply Inc v. Park Supply of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Supply Inc
Represented By: Michael R Laing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Supply of America Inc
Represented By: Austen Zuege
Represented By: Laura M Konkel
Represented By: Shane A Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?