Nuhn Industries Ltd v. Bazooka Farmstar LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nuhn Industries, Ltd. and Nuhn Industries Ltd
Defendant: Bazooka Farmstar, LLC, Tasch's Custom LLC and Bazooka Farmstar LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01322
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 1/14/2022 re: #20 Consent Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket the amended complaint and its exhibits, ECF 20-2 and 20-3, as a separate docket entry as of the date of this Order. (cc: all counsel)(MP)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Nuhn Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Exhibits 1-4 to First Amended Complaint)(Yackey, Scott)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 12/22/2021 re: #18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff must now file a response to Defendant Bazooka's and Defendant Tasch's motions to dismiss on or before January 19, 2022. Defendants Bazooka and Tasch must file their reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss on or before February 9, 2022. (cc: all counsel)(MP)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Motion to Dismiss Briefing by Nuhn Industries Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yackey, Scott)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #13 Proposed Document filed by Bazooka Farmstar LLC, #16 Proposed Document filed by Tasch's Custom LLC ; Proposed Orders should be e-filed as an attachment to the stipulation or motion and NOT e-filed as a separate document. Please ensure that the proposed orders have been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word format. These documents do not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Defendant Tasch's Custom LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Tasch's Custom LLC.(Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROPOSED (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Tasch's Custom LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Party Under Rule 21 or Alternatively to Stay filed by Tasch's Custom LLC. (Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Tasch's Custom LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tasch's Custom LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Party Under Rule 21 or Alternatively to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Compilation of Cited Unpublished Opinions)(Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tasch's Custom LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Party Under Rule 21 or Alternatively to Stay by Tasch's Custom LLC. (Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED (Proposed) Order Granting Defendant Bazooka Farmstar, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and 28 United States Code Section 1400(b) filed by Bazooka Farmstar LLC. (Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Eric Hahn in Support of Defendants Bazooka Farmstar, LLC and Tasch's Custom LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) and (12)(b)(6) (Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF in Support filed by Bazooka Farmstar LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bazooka Farmstar, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and 28 United States Code Section 1400(b) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Compilation of City Unpublished Opinions)(Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bazooka Farmstar, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Rule 12(b)(3) and 28 United States Code Section 1400(b) by Bazooka Farmstar LLC. (Howe, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R Howe on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Stephen R. Howe (Howe, Stephen)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nuhn Industries Ltd. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Yackey, Scott)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nuhn Industries Ltd. Bazooka Farmstar LLC served on 11/29/2021. (Yackey, Scott)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nuhn Industries Ltd. Tasch's Custom LLC served on 11/24/2021. (Yackey, Scott)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Tasch's Custom LLC. (kah)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Nuhn Industries Ltd (Yackey, Scott)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #4 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Nuhn Industries Ltd ; The attached summons was not saved properly so we are unable to issue it - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Nuhn Industries Ltd (Yackey, Scott)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (kah)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons for Tasch's Custom was not prepared using the version found on our website or was not saved properly so we are unable to issue it - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Bazooka Farmstar LLC. (kah)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Nuhn Industries, Ltd.. (Yackey, Scott)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Bazooka Farmstar, LLC, Tasch's Custom LLC by Nuhn Industries, Ltd.. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3974572) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - US9694636, #3 Exhibit 2 - US10974557, #4 Exhibit 3 - 4-14-21 Letter, #5 Exhibit 4 - '636 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit 5 - '557 Claim Chart, #7 Summons to Bazooka Farmstar, LLC, #8 Summons to Tasch's Custom LLC)(Yackey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuhn Industries Ltd v. Bazooka Farmstar LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuhn Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Yackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nuhn Industries Ltd
Represented By: Matthew L Cutler
Represented By: Scott Yackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bazooka Farmstar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasch's Custom LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bazooka Farmstar LLC
Represented By: Stephen R Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?