Procter v. Generac Holdings Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carey Don Procter
Defendant: Generac Holdings Inc, Aaron Jagdfeld and York A Ragen
Consolidated Plaintiff: Nahil Khami
Case Number: 2:2021cv01342
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 Stipulation of Schedule signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/10/22. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 30, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Schedule for Filing of Consolidated Complaint and Response Thereto by Carey Don Procter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calandra, Brian)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Consolidating Cases, Appointing Lead Plaintiff, and Approving Selection of Counsel signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/15/21. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 15, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman; related to Case No. 21cv1343. (kmm)
December 14, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (rcm)
December 13, 2021 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hines, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Hines on behalf of Generac Holdings Inc, Aaron Jagdfeld, York A Ragen. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael S. Hines (Hines, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Carroll on behalf of Generac Holdings Inc, Aaron Jagdfeld, York A Ragen. Attorney(s) appearing: James R. Carroll (Carroll, James)
December 1, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Calandra on behalf of Carey Don Procter. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian P. Calandra (Calandra, Brian)
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Carey Don Procter. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph A. Hood II (Hood, Joseph)
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A Lieberman on behalf of Carey Don Procter. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeremy A. Lieberman (Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER to counsel regarding Admission and ECF registration (jcl)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07009. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 22, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin filed by Defendants - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER #14 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #14 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (See minute order for details). Case transferred electronically on 11/19/2021. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
November 15, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE Of Waiver Of Oral Argument On The Unopposed Motion To Transfer Venue filed by Defendants Generac Holdings Inc., Aaron Jagdfeld, York A. Ragen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Milstead, Virginia) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
November 1, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carey Don Procterto NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin #14 Response to Motion to Transfer Venue (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin filed by Defendants Generac Holdings Inc., Aaron Jagdfeld, York A. Ragen. Motion set for hearing on 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of York A. Ragen, #2 Proposed Order) (Milstead, Virginia) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #11 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Defendants Generac Holdings Inc., Aaron Jagdfeld, and York. Ragen are not required to respond to the complaint previously filed in this action. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Generac Holdings Inc., Aaron Jagdfeld, York A. Ragen, (Milstead, Virginia) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants Generac Holdings Inc., Aaron Jagdfeld, York A. Ragen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Virginia F Milstead added to party Generac Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia F Milstead added to party Aaron Jagdfeld(pty:dft), Attorney Virginia F Milstead added to party York A. Ragen(pty:dft))(Milstead, Virginia) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. See order for complete details. (jre) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-06777 SVW(JPRx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07009 SVW(JPRx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Generac Holdings Inc., Aaron Jagdfeld, York A. Ragen. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carey Don Procter, (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Carey Don Procter. (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carey Don Procter. (Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31901985 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Carey Don Procter. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A) (Attorney Jennifer Pafiti added to party Carey Don Procter(pty:pla))(Pafiti, Jennifer) [Transferred from cacd on 11/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Procter v. Generac Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Don Procter
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generac Holdings Inc
Represented By: Virginia F Milstead
Represented By: James R Carroll
Represented By: Michael S Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Jagdfeld
Represented By: Virginia F Milstead
Represented By: James R Carroll
Represented By: Michael S Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York A Ragen
Represented By: Virginia F Milstead
Represented By: James R Carroll
Represented By: Michael S Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nahil Khami
Represented By: Casey E Sadler
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?