Haynes v. Obama
Plaintiff: James M Haynes
Defendant: President Barack Obama
Case Number: 2:2021cv01462
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk 1/4/22. The case is frivolous and must be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(MP)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 1/4/22. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(MP)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Appoint Private Investigator and Dentist, MOTION for Restraining Order by James M Haynes. (kah)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by James M Haynes. (kah)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James M Haynes. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
December 29, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. Notice mailed to plaintiff. (amb)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days. (kah)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by James M Haynes. (kah)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James M Haynes (contained in #1 Complaint). (kah)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Barack Obama filed by James M Haynes. (kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?