Thompson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Debara Thompson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2022cv00074
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 5/2/22;Plaintiff's brief due 6/13/22;Defendant's response due 7/25/22;Plaintiff's reply due 8/9/22. (cc: all counsel) (cmb)
March 3, 2022 DISREGARD; DOCKETED IN ERROR Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (asc) Modified on 3/3/2022 (asc).
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Service; Defendant served via certified mail on 3/2/2022 (Marvin, Cody) Modified on 3/3/2022 (asc).
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Debara Thompson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Marvin, Cody)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Debara Thompson. (Marvin, Cody)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Debara Thompson ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4022559) (Attachments: #1 ALJ decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marvin, Cody)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debara Thompson
Represented By: Cody T Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?