Thomas v. Pet Stuff Wisconsin LLC
Plaintiff: Colin Thomas
Defendant: Pet Stuff Wisconsin, LLC and Pet Stuff Wisconsin LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00085
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Colin Thomas. (Sanders, Craig)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Colin Thomas. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sanders, Craig)
March 15, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's office requesting status of the case. (mlm)
March 14, 2022 SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (mlm)
March 14, 2022 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 7 days; the form is available #here. (mlm)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colin Thomas. Pet Stuff Wisconsin LLC served on 2/1/2022. (Sanders, Craig)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Copyright Form AO121 mailed to Register of Copyrights Office. (mlm)
January 25, 2022 Summons Issued as to Pet Stuff Wisconsin, LLC. (mlm)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Pet Stuff Wisconsin, LLC by Colin Thomas. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4024341) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 PHOTOGRAPH #1, #2 Exhibit 2 INFRINGEMENT #1, #2, #3, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig)
January 24, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Pet Stuff Wisconsin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Thomas
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Stuff Wisconsin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Stuff Wisconsin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?