Borowski v. Maule et al
Plaintiff: John K Borowski, Jr
Defendant: Ms. Julie A Maule, Ms. trisha sizemore, Julie A Maule and Trisha L Sizemore
Case Number: 2:2022cv00106
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike by Julie A Maule. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(Haggenjos, Micaela)
March 10, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by John K Borowski, Jr re #12 Reply Brief in Support of Motion (kah)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Julie A Maule re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(Haggenjos, Micaela)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by John K Borowski, Jr re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss . (kah)
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julie A Maule (Haggenjos, Micaela)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by Julie A Maule re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss . (Haggenjos, Micaela)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss by Julie A Maule. (Haggenjos, Micaela)
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Julie A Maule. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hall, Samuel)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Julie A Maule (Tobin, Matthew)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Micaela Haggenjos on behalf of Julie A Maule. Attorney(s) appearing: Micaela E. Haggenjos (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Notice of Retainer)(Haggenjos, Micaela)
January 27, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
January 27, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Julie A Maule. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Tobin on behalf of Julie A Maule. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Tobin (Tobin, Matthew)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Tobin (Tobin, Matthew)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal by Julie A Maule (Filing Fee PAID $402 pay.gov receipt number 26UOO739) (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tobin, Matthew) Modified on 1/27/2022 (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borowski v. Maule et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John K Borowski, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Julie A Maule
Represented By: Matthew J Tobin
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. trisha sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A Maule
Represented By: Matthew J Tobin
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha L Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?