Antosh et al v. Village of Mount Pleasant et al
Plaintiff: Pamela J Antosh, Ned E. Lashley and Ned E Lashley
Defendant: Village of Mount Pleasant, David De Groot and Village of Mount Pleasant Community Development Authority
Case Number: 2:2022cv00117
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Smitha Chintamaneni . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Details Racine County Case 19-CV-1782, #2 Exhibit B - Signed Order from January 5, 2022 Motion Hearing (Doc. 77), #3 Exhibit C - Signed Order from January 5, 2022 Motion Hearing (Doc. 78), #4 Exhibit D - Letter to Court from Erik Olsen regarding Signed Orders)(Chintamaneni, Smitha)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . (Chintamaneni, Smitha)
March 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by All Defendants. (Chintamaneni, Smitha)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan H Marcuvitz on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Alan H. Marcuvitz (Marcuvitz, Alan)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Bazelon on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Adam S. Bazelon (Bazelon, Adam)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Smitha Chintamaneni on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Smitha Chintamaneni (Chintamaneni, Smitha)
March 10, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to BOTH PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (kah)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David De Groot - Waiver sent on 1/28/2022. (Olsen, Erik)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Village of Mount Pleasant Community Development Authority - Waiver sent on 1/28/2022. (Olsen, Erik)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Village of Mount Pleasant - Waiver sent on 1/28/2022. (Olsen, Erik)
January 31, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
January 31, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website and do not enter addresses for any party. Please refer to the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (vkb)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ned E. Lashley by Pamela J Antosh. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4029599) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Project Map, #2 Exhibit B - Jurisdictional Offer (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C - Award of Damages (Redacted), #4 Exhibit D - Relocation Order, #5 Exhibit E - Order of Racine County Circuit Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olsen, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antosh et al v. Village of Mount Pleasant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J Antosh
Represented By: Erik S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ned E. Lashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ned E Lashley
Represented By: Erik S Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Mount Pleasant
Represented By: Adam S Bazelon
Represented By: Alan H Marcuvitz
Represented By: Smitha Chintamaneni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David De Groot
Represented By: Adam S Bazelon
Represented By: Alan H Marcuvitz
Represented By: Smitha Chintamaneni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Mount Pleasant Community Development Authority
Represented By: Adam S Bazelon
Represented By: Alan H Marcuvitz
Represented By: Smitha Chintamaneni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?