Great Northern Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Barbara Warner, Stacy Terris, Susan Terris and Parkview Condominium Association
Defendant: Gree USA Inc and MJC American Ltd
Case Number: 2:2022cv00136
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 03/29/2022. Interim Settlement Report due by 11/25/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 12/01/2022; Final Settlement Report due by 02/21/2023; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 02/24/2023; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 03/01/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/07/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 03/13/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (AS) Modified on 3/30/2022 (bx).
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Dvorak, Amy)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/8/2022.As of 3/2/2022, all Defendants in this matter have appeared and submitted answers. The parties are ORDERED to submit a joint Rule 26 plan by 3/22/2022. The Court will then issue a written trial scheduling order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(1)(A). The parties should contact chambers if they have any questions. (cc: all counsel) (ld)
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J Rhoades on behalf of Gree USA Inc, MJC American Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Travis J. Rhoades (Rhoades, Travis)
March 2, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Gree USA Inc, MJC American Ltd.(Spoto, Marcella)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcella Spoto on behalf of Gree USA Inc, MJC American Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Marcella S. Spoto (Spoto, Marcella)
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dvorak, Amy)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. MJC American Ltd served on 2/11/2022. (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Gree USA Inc served on 2/14/2022. (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Great Northern Insurance Company, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company ; The incorrect assigned Magistrate Judge appears on the document. This document DOES need to be re-filed with correct Magistrate Judge labeled; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Dvorak, Amy)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L Dvorak on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Amy L. Dvorak (Dvorak, Amy)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Secura Supreme Insurance Company. (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Greenspan, Jeffrey)
February 3, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
February 3, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action chosen has been modified. The attached summons is not fillable - please file a Request for Issuance of Summons with a fillable summons form attached re Gree USA Inc. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
February 3, 2022 Summons Issued as to Gree USA Inc, MJC American Ltd. (rcm)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Cincinnati Insurance Company, Great Northern Insurance Company, Secura Supreme Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4032799) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Recall, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Greenspan, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company et al v. Gree USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey B Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secura Supreme Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey B Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey B Greenspan
Represented By: Amy L Dvorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Terris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Terris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkview Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc
Represented By: Marcella Spoto
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC American Ltd
Represented By: Marcella Spoto
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?