Clayborne v. Zerbst et al
Plaintiff: Jack A Clayborne
Defendant: Nurse Zerbst, Doctor Brown, James Matthews, Wellpath Medical Provider, Captain Gabor, Deputy Jail Administrator Lewandowski and Jail Administrator Wollenhaupt
Case Number: 2:2022cv00145
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/6/2022. On or before 4/27/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $18.47 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Jack Clayborne at Milwaukee County Jail; Milwaukee County Sheriff; Dennis Brand-Sheriff's Office)(cb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jack A Clayborne. (asc)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/4/2022 re #7 Plaintiff's Request for an Extension to Provide Account Statements. The court FINDS that the plaintiff has shown good cause and GRANTS his motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his trust account statement(s) for the six months before he filed his complaint, or explain why he cannot do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 20, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Jack Clayborne at Milwaukee County Jail; Milwaukee County Sheriff; Dennis Brand-Sheriff's Office)(cb)
April 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jack A Clayborne. (asc)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/10/2022 re #4 plaintiff's motion for extension of time. The court FINDS that the plaintiff has shown good cause and GRANTS his motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file a certified copy of his institutional trust account statement or statements is EXTENDED until the end of the day on March 30, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Jack Clayborne at Milwaukee County Jail)(cb)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jack A Clayborne. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Jack A Clayborne. (asc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jack A Clayborne. (asc)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (asc)
February 7, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jack A Clayborne. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clayborne v. Zerbst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack A Clayborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Zerbst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Medical Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Gabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jail Administrator Lewandowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Administrator Wollenhaupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?