Modory v. Kenosha Unified School District Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Sherri L Modory
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School Board, Yolanda Adams, Tony Garcia, Todd Battle, Mary Modder, Rebecca Stevens, Atifa Robinson, Todd Alan Price and Kenosha Unified School District Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2022cv00153
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 17 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sherri L Modory against Yolanda Adams, Todd Battle, Tony Garcia, Kenosha Unified School District Board of Education, Mary Modder, Todd Alan Price, Atifa Robinson, and Rebecca Stevens. (kwb)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 3/17/22: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, construed as a part of the motion to remand, is GRANTED. The document attached to the motion to remand, ECF No. #7 -1 at 11-18, is now the operative complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to remand, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED, and the case is REMANDED to state court. The Defendants' motion to dismiss, ECF No. #8 , is DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel, mailed to pro se party, Clerk of Court-Kenosha County Circuit Court)(kwb) Modified on 3/18/2022 (kah).
March 17, 2022 Case Terminated. (kwb)
February 23, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Remand filed by plaintiff Sherri L Modory (vkb)
February 23, 2022 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by plaintiff Sherri L Modory. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (vkb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants (Stadler, Ronald)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Ronald Stadler (Stadler, Ronald)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Stadler, Ronald)
February 15, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants (Stadler, Ronald)
February 15, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . (Stadler, Ronald)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Stadler, Ronald)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by plaintiff Sherri L Modory (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (bookmarked))(vkb)
February 10, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stadler, Ronald)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
February 9, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants on Sherri Modory (Stadler, Ronald)
February 8, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (cmb)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan E Sacks on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan E. Sacks (Sacks, Jonathan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S Stadler on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Ronald Stadler (Stadler, Ronald)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mary Modder, Yolanda Adams, Rebecca Stevens, Todd Alan Price, Kenosha Unified School Board, Atifa Robinson, Tony Garcia, Todd Battle from Circuit Court of Kenosha County, Case Number: 22CV55 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4037077) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, Circuit Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stadler, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modory v. Kenosha Unified School District Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri L Modory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School Board
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Adams
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Garcia
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Battle
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Modder
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Stevens
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atifa Robinson
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Alan Price
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha Unified School District Board of Education
Represented By: Jonathan E Sacks
Represented By: Ronald S Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?