PalatiumCare Inc v. Notify LLC et al
Plaintiff: PalatiumCare Inc and PalCare
Defendant: Notify LLC and Lucas Narbatovics
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv00217
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/25/2023. Upon consideration of #103 the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, the Court ADOPTS the briefing schedule in part as follows. On #27 Plaintiff's motion for sanctions, Plaintiff's supplemental brief in support thereof shall be due on or before 9/29/2023 and shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages; Defendants' supplemental response shall be due on or before 10/13/23 and shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. On #101 the response of the Register of Copyrights, the parties shall brief the following issues: (1) whether the Court should advise the U.S. Copyright Office that Plaintiff's supplementary registration applications can proceed despite the pendency of this litigation; (2) if the Court does so, whether it should find that the errors in the original registrations were material and what date it should deem to be the effective date of the amended registrations. Plaintiff shall submit a brief on these issues, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, on or before 10/13/2023. Defendants shall submit a brief on these issues, not to exceed fifteen (15) pages, on or before 10/27/2023. Plaintiff shall submit its reply brief, if any, not to exceed ten (10) pages, on or before 11/3/2023. The Court will not formally adopt the parties' stipulated date for closure of expert discovery; the parties remain free to modify this date. The Court will determine dates for summary judgment, pretrial filings, and trial as appropriate upon resolution of the above-referenced motions. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
August 16, 2023 Filing 103 JOINT PROPOSED Scheduling Order filed by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian) Modified on 8/17/2023 (bx).
July 21, 2023 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J P Stadtmueller: Status Conference held on 7/21/2023. (Court Reporter Sue Armbruster) (cw)
July 13, 2023 NOTICE OF HEARING: Counsel-Only Status Conference set for 7/21/2023 at 9:45 AM by Telephone before Judge J P Stadtmueller. The Court will initiate the call; counsel shall notify chambers at 414-297-1102 of the direct telephone number at which they may be reached no later than 12:00 PM on the day prior to the hearing. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
July 11, 2023 Filing 101 RESPONSE filed by United States of America re #99 Order on Motion to clarify, #95 Order on Motion for Referral,,, Order on Motion to Seal Document,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, (Larsen, Christian)
July 11, 2023 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Larsen on behalf of United States of America. Attorney(s) appearing: Chris R. Larsen (Larsen, Christian)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 5/1/2023 GRANTING #96 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify. #95 Court's Order Requesting Opinion from Register of Copyrights is CLARIFIED as provided. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via email to Register of Copyrights)(jm)
April 25, 2023 Filing 98 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #96 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Clarify April 13, 2023 Order . (Galster, Garet)
April 18, 2023 Filing 97 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn Certifying Meet-And- Confer re Motion for Clarification of April 13, 2023 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain)(Spahn, Brian)
April 18, 2023 Filing 96 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Clarify April 13, 2023 Order by PalatiumCare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spahn, Brian)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/13/2023. #35 Defendants' Motion for Referral to Register of Copyrights is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Court REQUESTS that the Register of Copyrights render an opinion on two specified questions within 90 days. #91 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. #85 Defendants' Motion to Restrict is GRANTED. #94 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Copyright Office Action is DENIED as moot. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via email to Register of Copyrights)(jm)
April 7, 2023 Filing 94 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Leave to File Notice by PalatiumCare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Copyright Office Action, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Copyright Action - 3/28/2023 email from Copyright Office, #3 Exhibit B to Notice of Copyright Action - Copyright Office's Response)(Spahn, Brian)
March 27, 2023 Filing 93 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lucas Narbatovics, Notify LLC re #91 Expedited MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Referral to Register of Copyrights . (Galster, Garet)
March 21, 2023 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn in Support of Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Referral to Register of Copyrights (Spahn, Brian)
March 21, 2023 Filing 91 Expedited MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Referral to Register of Copyrights by PalatiumCare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Sur-Reply)(Spahn, Brian)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/17/2023. Upon consideration of #86 Plaintiff's motion to compel production of Defendant Lucas Narbatovics's MacBook Pro, together with #89 Defendants' opposition, the motion is GRANTED in part. The Court said what it meant and meant what it said when it previously instructed Defendants to turn over the laptop. ECF No. 80 at 17. Defendants shall turn over Defendant Lucas Narbatovics's MacBook Pro to Plaintiffs within three (3) calendar days of the date of this Order. However, Plaintiff's request for an award of expenses and attorneys' fees incurred in bringing the motion to compel is DENIED. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
March 16, 2023 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Andrew Muller in opposition to Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 PalCare's Motion to Compel - State Action, #2 Defendants' Response to PalCare's Motion to Compel - State Action, #3 Excerpts from Hearing on PalCare's Motion to Compel - State Action)(Larson, Joseph)
March 16, 2023 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #86 Expedited MOTION to Compel Production of Defendant Lucas Narbatovics' MacBook Pro . (Larson, Joseph)
March 16, 2023 Filing 88 CERTIFICATE by PalatiumCare Inc Plaintiff's Certification to Expedited Motion to Compel Production of Defendant Lucas Narbatovics' MacBook Pro (Spahn, Brian)
March 16, 2023 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn in Support of Plaintiff's Expedited Motion to Compel Production of Defendant Plaintiff Lucas Narbatovic's MacBook Pro (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Transcript from 2-28-23 Final Pretrial Conference, #2 Exhibit B - 2-28-23 email exchange re production of MacBook Pro, #3 Exhibit C -3-10-23 email exchange re production of MacBook Pro, #4 Exhibit D - 3-13-23 email follow up re production of MacBook Pro, #5 Exhibit E - 3-13-23 email exchange re meet and confer, #6 Exhibit F - 9-26-22 Circuit Court Order, #7 Exhibit G - 5-4-21 Requests for Production, #8 Exhibit H - 6-4-21 Objections to Requests for Production)(Spahn, Brian) Modified on 3/16/2023 (lz).
March 16, 2023 Filing 86 Expedited MOTION to Compel Production of Defendant Lucas Narbatovics' MacBook Pro by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian)
March 10, 2023 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict Document by Lucas Narbatovics, Notify LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Reply Brief Dkt. 81, #2 Unredacted Galster Exhibit A - Geimer Deposition)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Galster, Garet)
March 10, 2023 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Jordan A. Liff (Galster, Garet)
March 10, 2023 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Tian Zhao (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zhao CV, #2 Exhibit B - Copyright Office Deposit Covers, First & Last)(Galster, Garet)
March 10, 2023 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Garet K. Galster (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Geimer Deposition Excerpts FILED RESTRICTED, #2 Exhibit B - Narbatovics TRO Hearing Testimony, #3 Exhibit C - 220930 Notify Interrogatories)(Galster, Garet)
March 10, 2023 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Lucas Narbatovics, Notify LLC re #35 MOTION for Referral to Register of Copyrights in Support of Motion for Referral. (Galster, Garet)
March 8, 2023 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference held on February 28, 2023 before Judge JP Stadtmueller Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan Armbruster, Contact at 414-290-2641. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found #on our website or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 4/3/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2023. (Armbruster, Susan)
February 28, 2023 Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/28/2023. The motions to restrict at ECF Nos. #45 , #53 , #59 are GRANTED; the documents that are the subject of those motions will remain restricted. Defendants' #44 expedited motion to exclude the testimony of Joseph Hasenstein pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 is DENIED. Defendants' #46 motion to exclude the testimony of Joseph Hasenstein pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 is DENIED. The Jury Trial originally scheduled to begin on 3/6/2023 is CANCELLED and will be rescheduled at a later date. See Minutes. (Court Reporter Sue Armbruster) (cw)
February 27, 2023 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn in Support of PalCare's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Excerpts from July 16, 2021 Hearing Transcript)(Spahn, Brian)
February 27, 2023 Filing 77 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Muller in support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Innovasafe Agreement, #2 SafeDeposit Confirmation Ticket 10-31-22, #3 Ong email 12-2-22, #4 Muller email 12-6-22, #5 SafeDeposit Confirmation Ticket 2-9-22, #6 Galster/Stulman emails)(Larson, Joseph)
February 27, 2023 Filing 76 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #39 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration . (Larson, Joseph)
February 25, 2023 Filing 75 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Rule 37 Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Preliminary Expert Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's First Set of RFPs, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - 7-1-2022 email from G. Galster, #5 Exhibit E - 7-12-2022 email from B. Spahn, #6 Exhibit F - Defendants' Responses to First Set of RFPs, #7 Exhibit G - 9-13-2022 email from A. Muller, #8 Exhibit H - 9-15-2022 email from A. Muller, #9 Exhibit I - 9-20-2022 email from J. Stulman, #10 Exhibit J - 9-21-2022 email from A. Muller, #11 Exhibit K - 10-5-2022 email from A. Ong, #12 Exhibit L - 10-27-2022 email from B. Spahn, #13 Exhibit M - 10-20-2022 email from A. Ong, #14 Exhibit N - 10-21-2022 email from A. Ong, #15 Exhibit O - InnovaSafe Notification of Notify Deposit, #16 Exhibit P - 11-10-2022 email from J. Stulman, #17 Exhibit Q - 10-28-2022 email from A. Muller, #18 Exhibit R - 11-9-2022 email from A. Ong, #19 Exhibit S - 12-12-2022 email from J. Stulman, #20 Exhibit T - 2-8-2023 email from A. Ong, #21 Exhibit U - 1-25-2023 email from J. Larson, #22 Exhibit V - 5-21-2022 email from B. Spahn, #23 Exhibit W - Erik Thompson Affidavit, #24 Exhibit X - 2-2-2023 email from B. Spahn, #25 Exhibit Y - 2-14-2023 email from A. Ong, #26 Exhibit Z - 2-16-2023 email from J. Larson, #27 Exhibit AA - 2-22-2023 email from A. Ong, #28 Exhibit BB - 12-6-2022 email from A. Muller, #29 Exhibit CC - 10-21-2022 email from A. Muller, #30 Exhibit DD - 10-12-2022 email from A. Ong)(Spahn, Brian)
February 25, 2023 Filing 74 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #39 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration . (Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Brian Spahn in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Expert Report of J.O. Mellor, Ph.D. and Related Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-Mail Exchange with Defendants' Counsel Ending on January 25, 2023, #2 Exhibit B - E-Mail Exchange with Defendants' Counsel That Includes January 26, 2023 E-Mail Referencing Expert Depositions and Opposing Counsel's January 27, 2023 E-Mail Response Acknowledging the Need to Discuss Expert Issues, #3 Exhibit C - E-Mail Dated February 3, 2023 Sent to Defendants' Counsel Summarizing Parties' Meet and Confer Call)(Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 72 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #50 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Mellor . (Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Brian Spahn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hasenstein Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Copies of Certificates Received by Joe Hasenstein from CompTIA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of Certificates Received by Joe Hasenstein from Microsoft)(Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 70 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #46 MOTION to Exclude Any Expert Testimony by Joseph Hasenstein . (Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Brian Spahn (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Geimer Deposition Excerpts, #2 Text of Proposed Order Employee Confidentiality, Shop Rights and Noncompetition Agreement PALCARE 003501, #3 Text of Proposed Order Employee Confidentiality, Shop Rights and Noncompetition Agreement PALCARE 003502, #4 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Agreement PALCARE 003475, #5 Text of Proposed Order E-Mail Between Tod Geimer and Greg Lawler, #6 Text of Proposed Order Hasenstein Deposition Excerpts)(Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 68 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #35 MOTION for Referral to Register of Copyrights . (Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 67 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #27 MOTION for Sanctions - Spoliation . (Spahn, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Jing Wang on behalf of PalatiumCare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jing Wang (Wang, Jing)
February 23, 2023 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Y Su on behalf of PalatiumCare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Su (Su, Eric)
February 23, 2023 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon R Smith on behalf of PalatiumCare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sharon Smith (Smith, Sharon)
February 22, 2023 Filing 63 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Rule 7(H) Motion to Exclude Experpt Testimony (dkt. 44) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from July 16, 2021 Hearing, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from November 2, 2022 Deposition of Lucas Narbatovics, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from April 29, 2021 Hearing)(Spahn, Brian)
February 22, 2023 Filing 62 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #44 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Exclude Joseph Hasenstein as an Expert Witness . (Spahn, Brian)
February 22, 2023 Filing 61 FINAL JOINT PRETRIAL REPORT by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian) (Attachment added on 2/28/2023: #1 Letter of Transmittal: FPT and Joint Trial Exhibits on 3 Flash Drives. (kwb). The 3 Flash Drives are maintained in JPS chambers. Modified on 6/1/2023. (kwb).
February 20, 2023 Filing 60 Report from expert John Phillip Mellor, Ph.D. (to replace Exhibit H to February 17, 2023 Declaration of Brian Spahn). This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Spahn, Brian)
February 20, 2023 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict Document and Substitute Exhibit H to the February 17, 2023 Declaration of Brian Spahn by PalatiumCare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spahn, Brian)
February 18, 2023 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Muller in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - PalCare Motion for TRO - State Court Case, #2 Ex 2 - Excerpt from Patnode deposition, #3 Ex 3 - Excerpts from TRO Hearing Transcripts, #4 Ex 4 - Excerpts from Schuler deposition, #5 Ex 5 - Inventory exemplar - Narbatovics hard drives, #6 Ex 6 - Excerpts from Hasenstein deposition)(Larson, Joseph)
February 18, 2023 Filing 57 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #27 MOTION for Sanctions - Spoliation . (Larson, Joseph)
February 17, 2023 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn regarding the Parties' Motions In Limine (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - April 6, 2021 Email, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Lucas Narbatovics 11/02/2022 Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpts from Casey Schuler Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit G - Emails re Damage Documents, #8 Exhibit H - RESTRICTED Mellor Report Excerpts, #9 Exhibit I - Defendants Third Set of Requests for Production, #10 Exhibit J - Registration Information for Pal Base 3 version 3.1.50, #11 Exhibit K - Registration Information for Device Test Suite, #12 Exhibit L - Litigation Statement Forms, #13 Exhibit M - Excerpts from Joseph Hasenstein Deposition Transcript, #14 Exhibit N - Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, #15 Exhibit O - Plaintiffs Responses to Requests for Production, #16 Exhibit P - Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories, #17 Exhibit Q - Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Second Set of Requests for Production, #18 Exhibit R - Plaintiffs Initial Expert Disclosures, #19 Exhibit S - Plaintiffs Responses to Narbatovics First Set of Interrogatories, #20 Exhibit T - Declaration of Garet Galster, #21 Exhibit T1 - Deposition Transcript of Lucas Narbatovics)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Spahn, Brian)
February 17, 2023 Filing 55 Joint MOTION in Limine with Support and Opposing Memoranda by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian)
February 17, 2023 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE by All Defendants of Meet and Confer Requirements re: Dkt. 50 (Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Restrict Document re: 52 by All Defendants. (Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 52 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #50 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Mellor . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 51 REDACTED BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #50 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Mellor . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PalCare Interrogatory Responses, #2 Unpublished Authority - Datacarrier, #3 Unpublished Authority - Ecimos, #4 Unpublished Authority - Nikish)(Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 50 MOTION to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Mellor by All Defendants. (Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE by All Defendants of Meet and Confer Requirements re: Dkt. 46 (Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Andrew Muller in Support of Daubert Motion re: Hasenstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hasenstein Deposition Excerpts)(Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 47 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #46 MOTION to Exclude Any Expert Testimony by Joseph Hasenstein . (Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION to Exclude Any Expert Testimony by Joseph Hasenstein by All Defendants. (Galster, Garet)
February 17, 2023 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Restrict Document Exhibit H to the Declaration of Brian C. Spahn by PalatiumCare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spahn, Brian)
February 15, 2023 Filing 44 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Exclude Joseph Hasenstein as an Expert Witness by All Defendants. (Larson, Joseph)
February 15, 2023 Filing 43 Report from PalatiumCare, Inc. Final Settlement Report. This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Spahn, Brian)
February 10, 2023 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE by All Defendants Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration (Larson, Joseph)
February 10, 2023 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Andrew Muller in support of Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration (Attachments: #1 Spahn Email 12-6-22, #2 PalCare Preliminary Expert Disclosures, #3 Muller Email 2-2-23, #4 Spahn Email 2-2-23, #5 Spahn Email 2-3-23, #6 Ong Email 2-3-23)(Larson, Joseph)
February 10, 2023 Filing 40 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #39 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration . (Larson, Joseph)
February 10, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Reports and Declaration by All Defendants. (Larson, Joseph)
February 10, 2023 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Lucas Narbatovics in Support of Motion for Referral (Galster, Garet)
February 10, 2023 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Garet K. Galster in Support of Motion for Referral (Galster, Garet)
February 10, 2023 Filing 36 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #35 MOTION for Referral to Register of Copyrights . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copyright Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - PalCare Notify RFA Responses, #3 Exhibit C - PalCare Notify ROG Responses, #4 Exhibit D - PalCare LN ROG Responses, #5 Exhibit E - PalCare 2nd RFA Responses)(Galster, Garet)
February 10, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION for Referral to Register of Copyrights by Lucas Narbatovics, Notify LLC. (Galster, Garet)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 2/6/2023. Upon consideration of #32 Defendants expedited motion for a Rule 26 protective order, the motion is DENIED. The #19 Trial Scheduling Order does not include a discovery cutoff date for the Court to enforce; Plaintiffs subpoena is therefore not untimely and the witness should attend his deposition as noticed. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
February 5, 2023 Filing 34 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Protective Order R37 Certification by All Defendants. (Larson, Joseph)
February 5, 2023 Filing 33 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - PalCare's R26 Initial Disclosures, #2 EX 2 - Defendants' R26 Initial Disclosures, #3 EX 3 - Notice of 3rd Party Subpoena, #4 EX 4 - Notice of Deposition, #5 EX 5 - PalCare's Supplemental R26 Disclosures)(Larson, Joseph)
February 5, 2023 Filing 32 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Larson, Joseph)
January 27, 2023 Filing 31 STATEMENT by PalatiumCare Inc Certification of Meet and Confer. (Spahn, Brian)
January 27, 2023 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Erik Thompson in Support of PalatiumCare's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thompson CV, #2 Exhibit B - 04-16-2021 Affidavit of Lucas Narbatovics, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Lucas Narbatovics 11-2-2022 deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Craig Patnode 01-19-2023 deposition)(Spahn, Brian)
January 27, 2023 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Brian C. Spahn in Support of PalatiumCare's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Lucas Narbatovics 11-2-2022 deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Craig Patnode 01-19-2023 deposition, #3 Exhibit C - 04-29-2021 TRO Hearing Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - Sheboygan County Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - 04-16-2021 Affidavit of Lucas Narbatovics, #6 Exhibit F - 04-16-2021 1:24 p.m. Email from Patnode, #7 Exhibit G - 04-16-2021 2:17 p.m. Email from Patnode, #8 Exhibit H - 04-07-2021 Email from Narbatovics)(Spahn, Brian)
January 27, 2023 Filing 28 BRIEF in Support filed by PalatiumCare Inc re #27 MOTION for Sanctions - Spoliation . (Spahn, Brian)
January 27, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Sanctions - Spoliation by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian)
December 12, 2022 Filing 26 Interim Settlement Report from Defendants Notify and Narbatovics . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Larson, Joseph)
December 12, 2022 Filing 25 Interim Settlement Report from PalatiumCare, Inc. . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Spahn, Brian)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/12/2022. Upon consideration of #23 Defendant Notify LLC's motion to extend the #19 operative Trial Scheduling Order, the motion is DENIED. While the Court recognizes the demands of caregiving on Defendants attorney Andrew Muller, the fact that Defendant has five attorneys of record demonstrates to the Court that a modification of the trial schedule is not necessary at this juncture. The dates in the Trial Scheduling Order will remain as originally scheduled. (cc: all counsel) (cw)
December 8, 2022 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Andrew P. Muller In Support of Defendant's Expedited Motion for 90 day Extension of Trial Scheduling Order (Larson, Joseph)
December 8, 2022 Filing 23 Expedited MOTION for Extension of Time of the Trial Scheduling Order by Notify LLC. (Larson, Joseph)
December 7, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Muller on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew P. Muller (Muller, Andrew)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/25/2022: GRANTING #20 Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order and SPECIFYING the terms as modified for confidential information produced or disclosed during this matter. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
August 2, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spahn, Brian)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/7/2022. Interim Settlement Report due by 12/12/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2022; Final Settlement Report due by 2/15/2023; Motions in Limine and Rule 702 Motions due by 2/17/2023; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 2/22/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
June 3, 2022 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by PalatiumCare Inc. (Attachments: #1 Joint ESI Protocols)(Spahn, Brian)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/20/22. (cc: all counsel) (cl)
May 20, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Larson on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph A Larson (Larson, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #10 filed by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian)
April 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Garet K Galster on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph A. Larson (Galster, Garet)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Spindler on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Melissa A. Spindler (Spindler, Melissa)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Liff on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jordan A. Liff (Liff, Jordan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Notify LLC. (Galster, Garet)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against PalatiumCare, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Lucas Narbatovics, Notify LLC . (Galster, Garet)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett M Schuman on behalf of PalatiumCare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brett M. Schuman (Schuman, Brett)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ong on behalf of PalatiumCare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew Ong (Ong, Andrew)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by PalatiumCare Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Spahn, Brian)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lucas Narbatovics - Waiver sent on 2/23/2022; Notify LLC - Waiver sent on 2/23/2022. (Spahn, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by PalatiumCare Inc (Spahn, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by PalatiumCare Inc (Spahn, Brian)
February 23, 2022 Summons Issued as to Lucas Narbatovics, Notify LLC. (bx)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Flaherty on behalf of PalatiumCare Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel T. Flaherty (Flaherty, Daniel)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by PalatiumCare Inc. (Spahn, Brian)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by PalatiumCare Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4047374) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spahn, Brian)
February 22, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PalatiumCare Inc v. Notify LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PalatiumCare Inc
Represented By: Daniel T Flaherty
Represented By: Brian C Spahn
Represented By: Andrew Ong
Represented By: Brett M Schuman
Represented By: Jennifer Burns Luz
Represented By: Eric Y Su
Represented By: Jing Wang
Represented By: Sharon R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PalCare
Represented By: Daniel T Flaherty
Represented By: Brian C Spahn
Represented By: Andrew Ong
Represented By: Brett M Schuman
Represented By: Jennifer Burns Luz
Represented By: Eric Y Su
Represented By: Jing Wang
Represented By: Sharon R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notify LLC
Represented By: Garet K Galster
Represented By: Jordan Liff
Represented By: Joseph A Larson
Represented By: Melissa A Spindler
Represented By: Andrew Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Narbatovics
Represented By: Garet K Galster
Represented By: Jordan Liff
Represented By: Joseph A Larson
Represented By: Melissa A Spindler
Represented By: Andrew Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Christian R Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?