Grant v. Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical
Plaintiff: Tony Leander Grant
Defendant: Aldrich Chemical Co LLC and Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical
Case Number: 2:2022cv00225
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Filing 13 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/20/22. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 4/20/22 granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
April 5, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (Mailed NEF via USPS to plaintiff) (asc)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tony Leander Grant. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical (McGrath, Tony)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (McGrath, Tony)
March 2, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical. (McGrath, Tony)
March 2, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McGrath, Tony)
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Woodson on behalf of Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical. Attorney(s) appearing: John T. Woodson (Woodson, John)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/23/2022) (jcl).
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aldrich Chemical Co LLC (McGrath, Tony)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Jesica Betts (McGrath, Tony)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aldrich Chemical Co LLC. (McGrath, Tony)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aldrich Chemical Co LLC from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22-cv-630 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4048434) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGrath, Tony)
February 23, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Leander Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Chemical Co LLC
Represented By: Tony H McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merk (EMD) Milliporesigma Aldrich Chemical
Represented By: John T Woodson
Represented By: Tony H McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?