Rucker v. Waukesha County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Eric T Rucker
Defendant: Waukesha County Jail, Sheriff Eric J Severson, Lt Shallow, Lieutenant Stefonek, CO Mueller, CO Walkowski, CO Scardino, CO Landess, CO Miller, Nursing Staff Memebers, Nursing Staff Member D. Johnson, Nursing Staff Member Matthews, Nursing Staff Member Neumann, Nursing Staff Members, D Johnson, Matthews and Neumann
Case Number: 2:2022cv00248
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/26/2022 GRANTING #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Within 45 days, Plaintiff shall RESPOND to #5 and #13 Defendants' pending motions. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Eric T Rucker)(jm)
April 20, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to acquire adequate legal counsel and representation by Eric T Rucker. (bx)
April 4, 2022 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Landess, CO Miller, CO Mueller, Scardino, Eric J Severson, Lt Shallow, Lieutenant Stefonek, Walkowski, Waukesha County Jail re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Summons of Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2)(5)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Doyle, Amy)
April 4, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Summons of Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2)(5)(6) by Landess, CO Miller, CO Mueller, Scardino, Eric J Severson, Lt Shallow, Lieutenant Stefonek, Walkowski, Waukesha County Jail. (Doyle, Amy)
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Pytlik on behalf of D Johnson, Matthews, Neumann. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul J. Pytlik (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pytlik, Paul)
March 22, 2022 Filing 11 EXHIBITS received for Eric T Rucker (bx)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Eric T Rucker. (bx)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS RECEIVED from Eric T Rucker to #1 Complaint. (bx)
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 EXHIBITS received for Eric T Rucker (bx)
March 11, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Eric T Rucker. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (bx)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Landess, CO Miller, CO Mueller, Scardino, Eric J Severson, Lt Shallow, Lieutenant Stefonek, Walkowski, Waukesha County Jail re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service to Nursing Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service to Plaintiff)(Haggenjos, Micaela)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Landess, CO Miller, CO Mueller, Scardino, Eric J Severson, Lt Shallow, Lieutenant Stefonek, Walkowski, Waukesha County Jail. (Haggenjos, Micaela)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
March 1, 2022 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (do not add punctuation or addresses)- please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J Doyle on behalf of Landess, CO Miller, CO Mueller, Scardino, Eric J Severson, Lt Shallow, Lieutenant Stefonek, Walkowski, Waukesha County Jail. Attorney(s) appearing: Amy J. Doyle (Doyle, Amy)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Micaela E. Haggenjos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint)(Haggenjos, Micaela)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CO Mueller, Eric J Severson, Walkowski, Landess, Waukesha County Jail, Scardino, Lt Shallow, CO Miller, Lieutenant Stefonek from Waukesha County, Case Number: 22-CV-171 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4051557) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Haggenjos, Micaela)
February 28, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucker v. Waukesha County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric T Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waukesha County Jail
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Eric J Severson
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Shallow
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Stefonek
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Mueller
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Walkowski
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Scardino
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Landess
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Miller
Represented By: Amy J Doyle
Represented By: Micaela Haggenjos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff Memebers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff Member D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff Member Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff Member Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Johnson
Represented By: Paul J Pytlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews
Represented By: Paul J Pytlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neumann
Represented By: Paul J Pytlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?