Sawyer v. Schad et al
Plaintiff: Karl WP Sawyer
Defendant: Nicholas Schad and Town of East Troy
Case Number: 2:2022cv00456
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/7/22. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 1/1/2023. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2023. Discovery due by 5/1/2023. Motions due by 5/1/2023. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Scheduling Conference held on 6/7/2022. The court approves the schedule and will issue a scheduling order shortly. Dispositive motions will be due on May 1, 2023. The parties shall contact the court if they are interested in mediation services. (kmr)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan for discovery by Karl WP Sawyer. (Coletti, Anthony) Modified on 6/6/2022 (jcl).
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karl WP Sawyer. (Coletti, Anthony)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/29/22.IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference is scheduled for June 7, 2022 at 9:45 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and the telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
April 27, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
April 27, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #7 Certificate of Service filed by Karl WP Sawyer ; The incorrect event was chosen. Summons Returned Executed found under Issuance and Service of Process is the proper event. This document does not need to be refiled.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Nicholas Schad served on 4/22/2022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karl WP Sawyer upon Nicholas Schad (Coletti, Anthony) Modified event on 4/27/2022 (kah).
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Karl WP Sawyer. (Coletti, Anthony)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Karl WP Sawyer. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Coletti, Anthony)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nicholas Schad, Town of East Troy. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cabush, Thomas)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Nicholas Schad, Town of East Troy.(Cabush, Thomas)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Nicholas Schad, Town of East Troy. (Cabush, Thomas)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Town of East Troy, Nicholas Schad from Walworth, Case Number: 22-CV-000153 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4089744) (Attachments: #1 Summons Exhibit A-Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cabush, Thomas)
April 14, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Schad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl WP Sawyer
Represented By: Anthony A Coletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Schad
Represented By: Thomas A Cabush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of East Troy
Represented By: Thomas A Cabush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?