Reck-N-Rack LLC v. Just Encase Products Inc
Plaintiff: Reck-N-Rack LLC
Defendant: Just Encase Products Inc
Case Number: 2:2022cv00503
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Just Encase Products Inc re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Schaefer, Alyssa)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Reck-N-Rack LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Galster, Garet)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Reck-N-Rack LLC. (Galster, Garet)
May 12, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Just Encase Products Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schaefer, Alyssa)
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Just Encase Products Inc re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10-26-21 Letter to R. Schmitt, #2 Exhibit B - 11-12-21 Letter to G. Galster from N. Longley, #3 Exhibit C - 4-1-22 Letter to G. Galster from P. Lancaster, #4 Exhibit D - 4-8-22 Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - 4-27-22 Notice of Removal)(Schaefer, Alyssa)
May 11, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Just Encase Products Inc. (Schaefer, Alyssa)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 5/6/2022. The court find good cause, the parties' stipulation to extend time to respond to the complaint (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint no later than May 12, 2022. The parties are reminded that any request of the court should be filed as a motion. #See "Tips for Practicing in Front of Judge Duffin,". (cc: all counsel)(mlm)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Just Encase Products Inc. (Schaefer, Alyssa) Modified on 5/6/2022 (mlm).
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Just Encase Products Inc. (Schaefer, Alyssa)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Just Encase Products Inc from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2022CV000525 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4100015) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Ex. A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Removal Notice Ex. B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schaefer, Alyssa)
April 27, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reck-N-Rack LLC v. Just Encase Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reck-N-Rack LLC
Represented By: Garet K Galster
Represented By: Jordan Liff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Encase Products Inc
Represented By: Alyssa Schaefer
Represented By: Nathaniel P Longley
Represented By: Peter M Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?