Babler et al v. Soo Line Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Trisha Babler and David Babler
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00560
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY filed by David Babler, Trisha Babler re #17 Response to Motion,,, filed by Defendant Soo Line Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Table of Authorities, #2 Exhibit A - Sprinkmann Website PO, #3 Exhibit B - T. Priebe Employment Card, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of T. Babler, #5 Exhibit D - Order Granting Sprinkmann MSJ)(Stern, Charles) Modified on 6/30/2022 (bx).
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Soo Line Railroad Company re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Table of Authorities, #2 Exhibit A -Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Sprinkmann's Answers to RFP, #4 Exhibit C - Depo of Leo Puddy, #5 Exhibit D -Depo of Krebsbach, #6 Exhibit E- Depo of Hagen, #7 Exhibit F - Depo of Koepke, #8 Exhibit G - MV Release and Affidavit, #9 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs' Expert Reports, #10 Exhibit I - Depo of Fitzpatrick, #11 Exhibit J - Depo of Spear, #12 Exhibit K - Sprinkmann MSJ, #13 Exhibit L - Plaintiff's Response Sprinkmann, #14 Exhibit M - Affidavits of Co-workers, #15 Exhibit N - Chart Re Discovery, #16 Exhibit O - Soo Line Discovery, #17 Exhibit P - Email, #18 Exhibit Q - Order MTD, #19 Exhibit R - Depo of Pat Mooney, #20 Exhibit S - Scheduling Order)(Peters, Thomas)
June 8, 2022 Filing 16 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Status Update by David Babler, Trisha Babler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Management Order)(Stern, Charles)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles P Stern on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Charles P. Stern (Stern, Charles)
May 27, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Charles Stern . (Attachments: #1 Ex. T to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand)(Stachowiak, Keith)
May 27, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Charles Stern . (Attachments: #1 Ex. P to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #2 Ex. Q to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #3 Ex. R to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #4 Ex. S to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #5 Ex. U to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #6 Ex. V to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #7 Ex. W to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #8 Ex. X to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #9 Ex. Y to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand)(Stachowiak, Keith)
May 27, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Charles Stern . (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #2 Ex. B to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #3 Ex. C to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #4 Ex. D to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #5 Ex. E to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #6 Ex. F to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #7 Ex. G to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #8 Ex. H to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #9 Ex. I to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #10 Ex. J to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #11 Ex. K to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #12 Ex. L to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #13 Ex. M to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand, #14 Ex. N to Aff of Stern re Plf Motion to Remand)(Stachowiak, Keith)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 ATTACHMENTS by All Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Stachowiak, Keith)
May 27, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Stachowiak, Keith)
May 25, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Stachowiak, Keith)
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stachowiak, Keith)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Keith Stachowiak . (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission to Practice)(Stachowiak, Keith)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda A Bialzik on behalf of Soo Line Railroad Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Melinda A. Bialzik (Bialzik, Melinda)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge JP Stadtmueller on 5/25/2022. (cc: all counsel) (ld)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Soo Line Railroad Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (O'Connor, Emily)
May 24, 2022 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Soo Line Railroad Company. (O'Connor, Emily)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER to Kathryn Llaurado regarding Admission and ECF registration (sent via USPS) (jcl)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Soo Line Railroad Company from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021cv395 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4113578) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plf's Response to Sprinkmann's MSJ, #2 Exhibit B- Order Granting Sprinkmann's MSJ, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit, #4 Complaint Exhibit D-Complaint, #5 Removal Notice Exhibit E - Notice of Removal State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Connor, Emily)
May 12, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babler et al v. Soo Line Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Babler
Represented By: Kathryn Llaurado
Represented By: Keith R Stachowiak
Represented By: Thadd J Llaurado
Represented By: Charlie Stern
Represented By: Charles P Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Babler
Represented By: Kathryn Llaurado
Represented By: Keith R Stachowiak
Represented By: Thadd J Llaurado
Represented By: Charlie Stern
Represented By: Charles P Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Represented By: Thomas R Peters
Represented By: Emily C O'Connor
Represented By: Melinda A Bialzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?