United States of America v. Approximately $7317 US Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $7317 US Currency and One Rose and White Gold Diamond Bracelet
Case Number: 2:2022cv00588
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Publication (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Advertisement Certification Report)(Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America to Esperanza Zurfluh (S. 64th Street address) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed - the defendant $7,317 in US currency in US Marshal Service custody (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 US Marshal 285 Form / Warrant for Arrest In Rem - returned executed by FBI as to the defendant rose and white gold diamond bracelet (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 18, 2022 Warrants for Arrest in Rem Issued (kah)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America to Esperanza Zurfluh of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America to Reynaldo Trevino (S. 34th Street address) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America to Reynaldo Trevino (Rawson Avenue address) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from AUSA Bridget J. Schoenborn to Clerk of Court. (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem to the United States Marshal, #3 Warrant for Arrest in Rem to the Federal Bureau of Investigation)(Schoenborn, Bridget)
May 17, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $7317 US Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bridget J Schoenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7317 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Rose and White Gold Diamond Bracelet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?