Simms et al v. Dobson et al
Plaintiff: Jesus M Simms, Tommy T Bush, Morningstar Thomas, Woodrow Stallings, Jr, Dennise White, Michael Howard, Aaron H Scott, Javier McCants, Thadous Beard, Dreshawn Freeman, Myrio Rogers, Brandon Jones, Jerod Brumfield, Anthony Johnson, Charles Roby, Noah Hunter, Christian Cardona, Iroquois Regazzi, Vann Pope, Marion Pattillo, Clifford E Bent, Lawrence Gregory Burns, Keveon Wade, Derrick Ellis, Dayquon Hill and Daryl Childress
Defendant: Inspector Dobson, Earnell Lucas, David Crowley, City of Milwaukee, Milwaukee County and Lawrence G Burns
Case Number: 2:2022cv00697
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received for CLIFFORD BENT: $28.64, receipt number MK4689-90671. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/11/2022 that on or before 11/10/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 189.46 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party Morningstar Thomas; Dennis Brand; Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(mlm)
October 7, 2022 Filing 74 Prisoner (4-month) Trust Fund Account Statement by Morningstar Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lz)
October 7, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE of Withdrawal from Case; REQUEST for Return of Funds; and NOTICE of Change of Address by Thadous Beard. Address updated to Dodge Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lz)
October 6, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Jesus M Simms. He is now at the Will County Adult Detention Facility in Joliet, IL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lz)
October 6, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Withdrawal from case by Noah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lz)
October 5, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: for Thadous Beard $125.60, receipt number MK4689-90620. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
October 5, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: for Noah Hunter $8.50, receipt number MK4689-90619. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
October 5, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: for Dreshawn Freeman $49.50, receipt number MK4689-90621. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (cmb)
October 4, 2022 Filing 70 LETTER from Morningstar Thomas re trust account statement requests. (edr)
September 29, 2022 Filing 69 MOTION to Withdraw from the case by Thadous Beard. (mlm)
September 27, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received for Tommy Bush: $78.15, receipt number MK4689-90558. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
September 26, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Jesus M Simms. Mr. Simms moved to Will County Adult Detention Facility. (Address updated.) (mlm)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/21/2022 that on or before 10/21/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 28.64 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Clifford Bent; Dennis Brand; Sheriff-Milwaukee County )(mlm)
September 19, 2022 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Clifford E Bent. (mlm)
September 15, 2022 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received from Marion Pattillo: $21.47, receipt number MK4689-90450. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (bx)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that on or before 10/7/2022 plaintiff Dreshawn Freeman shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 49.50 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/7/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff Dreshawn Freeman; Dennis Brand; Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(lz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that on or before October 7, 2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 8.50 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/7/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Noah Hunter, Dennis Brand, Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(mlm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that on or before 10/7/2022 plaintiff Thadous Levelle Beard shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 125.60 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/7/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff Thadous Levelle Beard; Dennis Brand; Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(lz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/7/2022 that on or before 10/7/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 78.15 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Tommy T Bush, Dennis Brand, Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(mlm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/7/2022, that on or before 10/7/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 151.56 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Dennis White, Dennis Brand, Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(mlm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/7/2022, that on or before 10/8/2022 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 18.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Woodrow Stallings Jr, Dennis Brand, Sheriff-Milwaukee County)(mlm)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/6/2022. By October 6, 2022, Clifford E. Bent must either file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, pay the full $402 filing fee, or file a notice of withdrawal. Failure to respond by this deadline will result in dismissal from the lawsuit and assessment of the full filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee form)(mlm)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/6/2022. By October 6, 2022, Morningstar Thomas must either file a certified copy of his trust account statement for the past six months, pay the full $402 filing fee, or file a notice of withdrawal. Failure to respond by this deadline will result in dismissal from the lawsuit and assessment of the full filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm) Modified on 9/7/2022 (mlm).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that on or before 10/6/2022 plaintiff Jesus M Simms shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 27.60 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/6/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Jesus Simms; Dennis Brand; Sheriff-Milwaukee County )(lz)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that on or before 10/6/2022 plaintiff Derrick Ellis shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 53.44 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/2/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Derrick Ellis, Dennis Brand, Sheriff-Milwaukee County Jail)(lz)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that on or before 10/6/2022 plaintiff Daryl Childress shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 34.63 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/2/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se plaintiff Daryl Childress, Dennis Brand, Sheriff-Milwaukee County Jail)(lz)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that on or before 10/6/2022 plaintiff Marion Pattillo shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 21.47 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/2/2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff Marion Pattillo; Dennis Brand; Sheriff-Milwaukee County Jail)(lz)
August 23, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Jesus M Simms requesting mail be sent to three different addresses. Court cannot do that. Address updated to PO Box noted under his signature. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lz)
August 22, 2022 Filing 52 Uncertified (Five Month) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dennise White. (lz) Modified to include time time period on 9/2/2022 (blr).
August 22, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dennise White. (lz)
August 12, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Morningstar Thomas. (mlm)
August 12, 2022 Filing 49 LETTER from Morningstar Thomas that he put in a request 3 weeks ago for his Prisoner Trust Account Statement and has not yet received it. (mlm)
August 5, 2022 Filing 48 Mail Sent to Tommy T. Bush Jr Returned as Undeliverable re 27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, (mlm)
August 3, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw from the case by Iroquois Regazzi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm) Modified on 8/4/2022 (mlm).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/3/2022 DENYING AS MOOT #43 Plaintiff Noah Hunter's motion for extension of time to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Hunter already filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff Noah Hunter)(lz)
July 27, 2022 Filing 45 Uncertified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Noah Hunter. (mlm) Modified on 7/28/2022 (mlm).
July 27, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Noah Hunter. (mlm)
July 27, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time by Noah Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm) Modified on 7/28/2022 (mlm).
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 7/26/2022 GRANTING #37 plaintiff Marion Pattillo's motion for extension of time to submit a certified trust account statement. Pattillo now has until August 22, 2022 to submit a certified trust account statement for the six months preceding the filing of the complaint. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se Plaintiff Marion Pattillo)(lz)
July 25, 2022 Filing 42 Mail Sent to Javier McCants Returned as Undeliverable re 27 Text Only Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (lz)
July 25, 2022 Filing 41 Mail Sent to Iroquois Regazzi Returned as Undeliverable re 27 Text Only Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (lz)
July 25, 2022 Filing 40 Uncertified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thadous Levelle Beard. (lz)
July 25, 2022 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Thadous Levelle Beard Jr. (lz)
July 21, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marion Pattillo. (lz)
July 21, 2022 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Marion Pattillo. (lz)
July 19, 2022 Filing 35 Uncertified (4-month) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tommy T Bush. (lz)
July 19, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tommy T Bush. (lz)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 7/19/2022, GRANTING plaintiffs Thadous Beard's, Dennis White's, and Vann Pope's motions for extension of time to move to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee and submit a certified trust account statement. ( #28 , #31 , #32 ). These plaintiffs now have until August 22, 2022, to move to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee and submit a certified trust account statement. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
July 18, 2022 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Inital Partial Filing Fee by Vann Pope. (mlm)
July 18, 2022 Filing 31 MOTION to File form to Proceed Without Prepayment, MOTION for Extension of Time to file Trust Account Statement by Dennise White. (mlm)
July 18, 2022 Filing 30 Prisoner (4 Month) Trust Fund Account Statement by Dreshawn Freeman. (mlm)
July 18, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dreshawn Freeman. (mlm)
July 18, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File form to Proceed without Preyament of filing fee and to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by Thadous Beard. (mlm).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 7/18/2022 granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time GRANTING plaintiff Tommy T. Bush, Jr.'s motion for extension of time to move to pay the initial partial filing fee. #26 . Bush must file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee along with a certified copy of his trust account statement for the six months preceding the complaint by August 22, 2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Trust Account Statement by Tommy T Bush, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lz)
July 14, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw by Lawrence Gregory Burns. (mlm)
July 12, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw by Keveon Wade. (mlm)
July 12, 2022 Filing 23 Uncertified (5-month) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Derrick Ellis. (lz)
July 12, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Derrick Ellis. (lz)
July 11, 2022 Filing 21 Uncertified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Marion Pattillo. (lz)
July 11, 2022 Filing 20 Uncertified (Five-Month) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Clifford E Bent. (lz)
July 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Withdrawal from Lawsuit by Myrio Rogers. (lz)
July 11, 2022 Filing 18 Uncertified Partial Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Woodrow Stallings, Jr. (lz)
July 11, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Woodrow Stallings, Jr. (lz)
July 11, 2022 Party Myrio Rogers terminated pursuant to #19 Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal from Lawsuit. (lz)
July 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Withdrawal from Lawsuit by Christian Cardona. (lz)
July 8, 2022 Filing 15 Uncertified (2 month) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Daryl Childress. (lz)
July 8, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Daryl Childress. (lz)
July 8, 2022 Plaintiff Christian Cardona terminated per ECF No #16 Notice of Withdrawal from Lawsuit. (lz)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Sent to Javier McCants Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order. (mlm)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 Mail Sent to Anthony Johnson Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order. (mlm)
July 5, 2022 Filing 11 Mail Sent to Iroquois Regazzi Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order (mlm)
July 1, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw by Lawrence Gregory Burns. (mlm)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff Jesus M. Simms re this case. (mlm)
June 27, 2022 Filing 8 Uncertified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jesus M Simms. (mlm)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/21/2022. Any plaintiff who no longer wishes to continue with this action must notify the court in writing by July 21, 2022, of his desire to withdraw. A plaintiff who withdraws by the deadline will not have to pay a filing fee. Plaintiffs who wish to proceed with this action and who have not already done so must submit either the $402 filing fee or a request to proceed without prepaying the filing fee and a certified trust account statement by July 21, 2022. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se parties)(mlm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class by Clifford E Bent, Lawrence G Burns, Tommy T Bush, Jesus M Simms, Woodrow Stallings, Jr, Morningstar Thomas, Dennise White. (mlm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Clifford E Bent, Lawrence G Burns, Tommy T Bush, Michael Howard, Jesus M Simms, Woodrow Stallings, Jr, Morningstar Thomas, Dennise White. (mlm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jesus M Simms. This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(mlm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 SECOND AFFIDAVIT of Jesus Simms in Support of Class Action Complaint Under the Civil Rights Act. (mlm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Jesus Simms in Support of Class Action Complaint. (mlm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Myrio Rogers, Clifford E Bent, Aaron H Scott, Christian Cardona, Tommy T Bush, Jesus M Simms, Iroquois Regazzi, Jerod Brumfield, Noah Hunter, Michael Howard, Morningstar Thomas, Thadous Beard, Brandon Jones, Anthony Johnson, Marion Pattillo, Charles Roby, Javier McCants, Woodrow Stallings, Jr, Dreshawn Freeman, Vann Pope, Dennise White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - List of Violations)(mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simms et al v. Dobson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus M Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy T Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morningstar Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodrow Stallings, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennise White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron H Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thadous Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreshawn Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrio Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerod Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Roby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iroquois Regazzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vann Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Pattillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford E Bent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Gregory Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keveon Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayquon Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspector Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnell Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Milwaukee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence G Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?