United States of America v. Eleven Assorted Jewelry Items
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eleven Assorted Jewelry Items
Claimant: Willie Etherly
Case Number: 2:2022cv00748
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 13 CLAIM Under Rule G(5) by Willie Etherly. (Donovan, Christopher)
August 12, 2022 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Willie Etherly. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Donovan, Christopher)
August 10, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Publication (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Advertisement Certification Report)(Schoenborn, Bridget)
August 3, 2022 NOTICE from the clerk to CLAIMANT; Willie Etherly requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (edr)
August 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Willie Etherly AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE RULE G(5)(a) CLAIM AND ANSWER (Donovan, Christopher)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Donovan on behalf of Willie Etherly. Attorney(s) appearing: Chris Donovan (Donovan, Christopher)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Willie Etherly AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE RULE G(5)(a) CLAIM AND ANSWER (UNSIGNED) (Donovan, Christopher) Modified on 8/3/2022 (rcm).
August 2, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Donovan on behalf of Willie Etherly (UNSIGNED). Attorney(s) appearing: Chris Donovan (Donovan, Christopher) Modified on 8/3/2022 (rcm).
August 2, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Willie Etherly, #8 Notice filed by Willie Etherly ; All documents must contain an electronic signature. You must RE-FILE this document.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (rcm)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed - defendant property in U.S. Marshal Service custody (Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 29, 2022 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued (rcm)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America to Willie Etherly, in care of Attorney Christopher D. Donovan, of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America to Willie Etherly of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER from AUSA Bridget J. Schoenborn to Clerk of Court. (Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Forfeiture In Rem against Eleven Assorted Jewelry Items by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Schoenborn, Bridget)
June 28, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Eleven Assorted Jewelry Items
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bridget J Schoenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleven Assorted Jewelry Items
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Willie Etherly
Represented By: Christopher D Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?