Nagel v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Vickie Nagel
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2022cv00914
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 7, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Kilolo Kijakazi (Pawlak, Brian)
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Godfrey on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Jean Godfrey (Godfrey, Jean)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Vickie Nagel. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Establishing Appeal Procedure signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 8/15/22. Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 10/11/22;Plaintiff's brief due 11/20/22;Defendant's response due 12/30/22;Plaintiff's reply due 1/4/23. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
August 12, 2022 SERVICE OF COMPLAINT - Pursuant to the #Eastern District of Wisconsin's Memorandum of Understanding, the Commissioner and U.S. Attorney's Office have been electronically served with the Social Security appeal via CM/ECF. NOTICE to Plaintiff - Service on the Commissioner in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the Commissioner requests otherwise. (blr)
August 10, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Vickie Nagel. (Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Vickie Nagel ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4182503) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drexler-Dreis, Leah)
August 10, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagel v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Nagel
Represented By: Leah A Drexler-Dreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Jean Marie Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?